Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1581533

EP1581533 - NOVEL BENZONAPHTHYRIDINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.06.2009
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nycomed GmbH
Byk-Gulden-Strasse 2
78467 Konstanz / DE
[2007/32]
Former [2005/40]For all designated states
ALTANA Pharma AG
Byk-Gulden-Strasse 2
78467 Konstanz / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FLOCKERZI, Dieter
Ackerweg 26
78476 Allensbach / DE
02 / KAUTZ, Ulrich
Prof.-Schmider-Str. 12
78476 Allensbach / DE
03 / SCHMIDT, Beate
Allensbacher Str. 5
78476 Allensbach / DE
04 / WEINBRENNER, Steffen
Luzzilonweg 4
78465 Konstanz / DE
05 / HATZELMANN, Armin
Alter Wall 3
78467 Konstanz / DE
06 / BARSIG, Johannes
Am alten Sägewerk 14
78467 Konstanz / DE
07 / MARX, Degenhard
Obere Reute 15
78345 Moos / DE
08 / KLEY, Hans-Peter
Hafnerstr. 12
78476 Allensbach / DE
09 / DAVID, Michael
Wassergasse 20
78333 Stockach / DE
10 / ROCKER, Dirk
Herzenstr. 5
78315 Radolfzell / DE
 [2007/08]
Former [2006/51]01 / FLOCKERZI, Dieter
Ackerweg 26
78476 Allensbach / DE
02 / KAUTZ, Ulrich
Prof.-Schmider-Str. 12
78476 Allensbach / DE
03 / SCHMIDT, Beate
Allensbacher Str. 5
78476 Allensbach / DE
04 / WEINBRENNER, Steffen
Luzzilonweg 4
78465 Konstanz / DE
05 / HATZELMANN, Armin
Alter Wall 3
78467 Konstanz / DE
06 / BARSIG, Johannes
Bleichenweg 11
78467 Konstanz / DE
07 / MARX, Degenhard
Obere Reute 15
78345 Moos / DE
08 / KLEY, Hans-Peter
Hafnerstr. 12
78476 Allensbach / DE
09 / DAVID, Michael
Wassergasse 20
78333 Stockach / DE
10 / ROCKER, Dirk
Herzenstr. 5
78315 Radolfzell / DE
Former [2005/40]01 / FLOCKERZI, Dieter
Ackerweg 26
78476 Allensbach / DE
02 / KAUTZ, Ulrich
Prof.-Schmider-Str. 12
78476 Allensbach / DE
03 / SCHMIDT, Beate
Allensbacher Str. 5
78476 Allensbach / DE
04 / WEINBRENNER, Steffen
Luzzilonweg 4
78465 Konstanz / DE
05 / HATZELMANN, Armin
Alter Wall 3
78467 Konstanz / DE
06 / BARSIG, Johannes
Bleichenweg 11
78467 Konstanz / DE
07 / MARX, Degenhard
Obere Reute 15
78345 Moos / DE
08 / KLEY, Hans-Peter
Im Weinberg 3b
78476 Allensbach / DE
09 / DAVID, Michael
Wassergasse 20
78333 Stockach / DE
10 / ROCKER, Dirk
Herzenstr. 5
78315 Radolfzell / DE
Representative(s)Wild, Robert
Takeda GmbH
Postfach 10 03 10
78403 Konstanz / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/40]Wild, Robert
c/o ALTANA Pharma AG, Byk-Gulden-Strasse 2
78467 Konstanz / DE
Application number, filing date03792314.113.08.2003
[2005/40]
WO2003EP08996
Priority number, dateEP2002001852917.08.2002         Original published format: EP 02018529
[2005/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004018465
Date:04.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1581533
Date:05.10.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004
[2005/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, A61K31/47, A61P11/08
[2005/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/40]
Extension statesAL17.03.2005
LT17.03.2005
LV17.03.2005
MK17.03.2005
TitleGerman:BENZONAPHTHYRIDINE MIT PDE 3/4 HEMMENDER WIRKUNG[2005/40]
English:NOVEL BENZONAPHTHYRIDINES[2005/40]
French:NOUVELLES BENZONAPHTYRIDINES[2005/40]
Entry into regional phase17.03.2005National basic fee paid 
17.03.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/40]
16.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/30]
02.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO9821208  (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB ;FLOCKERZI DIETER (DE)) [YD] 1-16 * claim 1 *;
 [YD]WO9957118  (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB ;FLOCKERZI DIETER (DE)) [YD] 1-16 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]EP1270577  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) [Y] 1-16 * see compound 150, page 157 *;
 [A]EP0490823  (SANDOZ LTD ;SANDOZ AG (DE); SANDOZ AG (AT)) [A] 1-16 * claim 1 *;
 [PX]WO02066476  (BYK GULDEN LOMBERG CHEM FAB ;FLOCKERZI DIETER (DE)) [PX] 1-16 * claim 1 *