Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1540227

EP1540227 - THREADED TUBE JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 25.10.2017 [2017/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tenaris Connections Ltd.
112 Bonadie Street
Kingstown / VC
[2013/13]
Former [2007/50]For all designated states
Tenaris Connections AG
Bahnhofstrasse 7 Postfach 48
9494 Schaan / LI
Former [2005/24]For all designated states
Tenaris Connections AG
Bahnofstrasse 7, Postafch 48
9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / CARCAGNO, Gabriel, E.
Berutti 495
Campana (B), Argentina / AR
02 / TOSCANO, Rita, G.
Goya 285, Buenos Aires
Argentina / AR
03 / NAKAMURA, Hisao
2-15-37 Morigaoka, Isogo-Ku
Yokohama-City 235-0024 / JP
04 / COPPOLA, Tommaso
Via Domenico Purificato, 188
I-00125 Roma / IT
05 / ONO, Tatsuo
229-7 Araicho Hodogayaku
Yokohamashi Kanagawa 240-0053 / JP
 [2005/24]
Representative(s)Cinquantini, Bruno
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2005/24]Cinquantini, Bruno
Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A, Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milan / IT
Application number, filing date03793808.106.09.2003
WO2003EP09870
Priority number, dateIT2002RM0044506.09.2002         Original published format: IT RM20020445
[2005/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004023020
Date:18.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1540227
Date:15.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004
[2005/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1540227
Date:12.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/50]
Search report(s)International search reportEP18.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:F16L15/06
[2005/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/24]
Former [N/P]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROHRANSCHLUSSSTÜCK MIT GEWINDE[2005/24]
English:THREADED TUBE JOINT[2005/24]
French:JOINT DE TUBE FILET[2005/24]
Entry into regional phase05.04.2005National basic fee paid 
05.04.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.04.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/24]
07.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2007Fee for grant paid
25.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2015Observations by third parties
06.07.2015Observations by third parties
17.03.2016Observations by third parties
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.09.2008  09.10.2008  ADMISSIBLE
VALLOUREC OIL AND GAS FRANCE
54, rue Anatole France
59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR
Opponent's representative
de Kernier, Gabriel, et al
Cabinet Netter Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
 [2015/31]
Former [2014/07]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2008  09.10.2008  ADMISSIBLE
VALLOUREC OIL AND GAS FRANCE
54, rue Anatole France
59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR
Opponent's representative
Pellicani, Félix Angelo, et al
Vallourec & Mannesman Tubes Division Propriété Industrielle 27 Avenue du Général Leclerc
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2008/45]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2008   
VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE
54, rue Anatole France
59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR
Opponent's representative
Pellicani, Félix Angelo, et al
Vallourec & Mannesman Tubes Division Propriété Industrielle 27 Avenue du Général Leclerc
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
22.10.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.02.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.12.2010Date of oral proceedings
21.01.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.01.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
14.04.2016Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/42]
Appeal following opposition04.03.2011Appeal received No.  T0577/11
26.05.2011Statement of grounds filed
14.04.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
03.08.2015Date of oral proceedings
21.08.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
14.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
07.06.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
07.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.12.2007
CZ12.12.2007
EE12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
SK12.12.2007
BG12.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
HU13.06.2008
IE08.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
[2017/40]
Former [2017/31]CY12.12.2007
CZ12.12.2007
EE12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
SK12.12.2007
BG12.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
HU13.06.2008
IE08.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2017/12]CY12.12.2007
CZ12.12.2007
EE12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
SK12.12.2007
BG12.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
HU13.06.2008
IE08.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2011/32]CY12.12.2007
CZ12.12.2007
EE12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
SK12.12.2007
BG12.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
HU13.06.2008
IE08.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2010/34]CY12.12.2007
CZ12.12.2007
EE12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
SK12.12.2007
BG12.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
HU13.06.2008
IT06.09.2008
IE08.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/40]CY12.12.2007
CZ12.12.2007
EE12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
SK12.12.2007
BG12.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
IT06.09.2008
IE08.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/35]CY12.12.2007
CZ12.12.2007
EE12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
SK12.12.2007
BG12.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
IE08.09.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/23]CZ12.12.2007
EE12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
SK12.12.2007
BG12.03.2008
PT12.05.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/22]CZ12.12.2007
EE12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
SK12.12.2007
PT12.05.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2009/20]CZ12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
SK12.12.2007
PT12.05.2008
MC30.09.2008
Former [2008/42]CZ12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
SK12.12.2007
PT12.05.2008
Former [2008/39]CZ12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
SK12.12.2007
Former [2008/36]CZ12.12.2007
FI12.12.2007
Former [2008/25]FI12.12.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]US4384737  (REUSSER HANS E) [A] 2-9 * column 8, line 20 - line 29; figures 4,5 *;
 [A]EP0916883  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 2-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1203909  (HYDRIL CO [US]) [A] 2-9 * column 3, line 27 - line 31; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO0194831  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) [A] 2-9 * abstract *;
 [A]US4153283  (HELLMUND WOLFGANG, et al) [A] 2-9 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0713952  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 2-9 * figures 1a,2b,5c *;
 [A]EP1020674  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 2-9 * figure - *
by applicantUS4623173
otherWO03048623
 US3870351
 FR1564218
 WO0066928
 US5007665
 FR1489013
 EP0708224
 US2002017788
 EP0916883
    - "CONTACT MECHANICS", WIKIPEDIA, THE FREE ENCYCLOPEDIA, (20100908), pages 1 - 15, URL: HTTPS://EN.WIKIPEDIA.ORG/WIKI/CONTACT_MECHANICS, XP003036008