|
06.09.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
109 |
|
22.03.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2016 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2016 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.2016 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.03.2016 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2016 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
213 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
76 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
215 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
34 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
18 |
|
18.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
13 |
|
02.02.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.01.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
28.01.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.07.2015 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2015 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2015 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
03.07.2015 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
01.07.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
299 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
299 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
26.06.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
26 |
|
12.05.2015 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
26 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.03.2015 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
9 |
|
21.06.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.06.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2011 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
17.03.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2010 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.03.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.09.2008 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2005 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.12.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.12.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.11.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.11.2004 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.11.2004 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.11.2004 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
04.02.2004 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.11.2003 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
27.10.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |