Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1546948

EP1546948 - SIMULATION OF THE MOVEMENT OF AN AUTONOMOUS ENTITY THROUGH AN ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.10.2011
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Connor, James, Douglas
Parc Saint Roman
7 Avenue Saint Roman
MC98000 Monaco / MC
[2017/52]
Former [2005/26]For all designated states
The Maia Institute
Patio Palace, 41 Avenue Hector Otto
98000 Monaco / MC
Inventor(s)01 / KAGARLIS, Marios
15 Avenue Crovetto Frères
MC 98000 Monaco / MC
 [2005/26]
Representative(s)Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/52]Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej , et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Former [2005/26]Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date03793825.509.09.2003
WO2003EP50616
Priority number, dateUS2002023717809.09.2002         Original published format: US 237178
[2005/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004023347
Date:18.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1546948
Date:29.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004
[2005/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50
[2005/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/26]
Former [N/P]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SIMULATION DER BEWEGUNG VON AUTONOMEN ENTITûTEN DURCH EINE UMGEBUNG[2005/26]
English:SIMULATION OF THE MOVEMENT OF AN AUTONOMOUS ENTITY THROUGH AN ENVIRONMENT[2005/26]
French:DEPLACEMENT D'UNE ENTITE AUTONOME A TRAVERS UN ENVIRONNEMENT[2005/26]
Entry into regional phase24.03.2005National basic fee paid 
24.03.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.03.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/26]
27.05.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2011Observations by third parties
30.04.2013Date of oral proceedings
23.08.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
26.08.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination04.11.2013Appeal received No.  T0489/14
06.01.2014Statement of grounds filed
11.04.2018Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP18166562.1
EP18192277.4
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.04.2008
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
30.09.2011Request for further processing filed
30.09.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.10.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
14.11.2008Request for further processing filed
14.11.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.11.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
17.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
16.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
16.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
20.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
19.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
05.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
18.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
20.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
22.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201311   M06   Fee paid on   05.11.2013
30.09.201513   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2002062207  (FAGHRI ARDESHIR [US]) [A] 1-48 * column W *
 [X]  HOSOI R ET AL, "Dynamical model of a pedestrian in a crowd", ROBOT AND HUMAN COMMUNICATION, 1996., 5TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON TSUKUBA, JAPAN 11-14 NOV. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19961111), ISBN 0-7803-3253-9, pages 44 - 49, XP010212810 [X] 1-48 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROMAN.1996.568648
 [X]  HELBING D ET AL, "Social force model for pedestrian dynamics", PHYS. REV. E, STAT. PHYS. PLASMAS FLUIDS RELAT. INTERDISCIP. TOP. (USA), PHYSICAL REVIEW E (STATISTICAL PHYSICS, PLASMAS, FLUIDS, AND RELATED INTERDISCIPLINARY TOPICS), MAY 1995, USA, (199505), vol. 51, no. 5, pt.A, ISSN 1063-651X, pages 4282 - 4286, XP002277054 [X] 1-48 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevE.51.4282
 [A]  GOLDENSTEIN S ET AL, "Scalable dynamical systems for multi-agent steering and simulation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION. ICRA 2001. SEOUL, KOREA, MAY 21 - 26, 2001, PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010521), VOL. 1 OF 4, ISBN 0-7803-6576-3, pages 3973 - 3980, XP010550757 [A] 1-48 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.2001.933237
by applicant   M. HOSOI ET AL., "Dynamic Model of a Pedestrian Crowd", IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON ROBOT AND HUMAN COMMUNICATION, (1996), pages 44 - 49,
    DIRK HELBING, "A mathematical model for the behavior of pedestrians", BEHAVIORAL SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 36, doi:doi:10.1002/bs.3830360405, pages 298 - 310, XP001573399

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bs.3830360405
    DIRK HELBING, PETER MOLNAR, "Social force model for pedestrian dynamics", PHYS. REV. E, (1995), vol. 51, no. 5, pages 4282 - 4286,
    DIRK HELBING, ILLES FARAKAS, TAMAS VICSEK, "Simulating dynamical features of escape panic", NATURE, (2000), vol. 407, pages 487 - 490,
    DIRK HELBING, "Self-organizing pedestrian movement", ENVIRONMENT AND PLANNING B: PLANNING AND DESIGN, (2001), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1068/b2697, pages 361 - 383, XP001586701

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1068/b2697
    PETER A. THOMPSON, ERIC W. MARCHANT, "Computer model for the evaluation of large building populations", FIRE SAFETY JOURNAL, vol. 24, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0379-7112(95)00019-P, pages 131 - 148, XP001573400

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0379-7112(95)00019-P
other   - HELBING D. ET AL, "Social force model for pedestrian dynamics", PHYSICAL REVIEW E. STATISTICAL PHYSICS, PLASMAS, FLUIDS, AND RELATED INTERDISCIPLINARY TOPICS, (19950501), vol. 51, no. 5,PT.A, pages 4282 - 4286, XP002277054

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevE.51.4282
    - DIJKSTRA E.W., "NOTE ON TWO PROBLEMS IN CONNEXION WITH GRAPHS", NUMERISCHE MATHEMATIK, (19590101), vol. 1, pages 269 - 271, XP000837527

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01386390
    - BURSTEDDE C. ET AL, "Simulation of pedestrian dynamics using a two-dimensional cellular automaton", PHYSICA, (20010615), vol. A 295, no. 3-4, pages 507 - 525, XP002603737
    - HART P.E. ET AL, "A Formal Basis for the Heuristic Determination of Minimum Cost Paths", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS SCIENCE AND CYBERNETICS, (19680701), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 100 - 107, XP011163309
    - HOOGENDOORN S.P., "Normative Pedestrian Flow Behavior, Theory and Applications", RAPPORT, 20010501, DELFT UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY, FACULTEIT DER CIVIELE TECHNIEK, VAKGROEPVERKEER, NL, (20010501), pages 1 - 47, XP009154161
    - HELBING D. ET AL, "Simulating dynamical features of escape panic", NATURE: INTERNATIONAL WEEKLY JOURNAL OF SCIENCE, (20000928), vol. 407, pages 487 - 490, XP009154157

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35035023
    - TURNER ET AL, "Encoding natural movement as an agent-based system: an investigation into human pedestrianbehaviour in the built environment", ENVIRONMENT AND PLANNING B: PLANNING AND DESIGN, (20020101), vol. 29, pages 473 - 490, XP009154162

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1068/b12850
    - PENN ET AL, "Space Syntax Based Agent Simulation.", PEDESTRIAN AND EVACUATION DYNAMICS : [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PEDESTRIAN ANDEVACUATION DYNAMICS, HELD AT THE GERHARD-MERCATOR-UNIVERSITY DUISBURG, (20010404), pages 99 - 114, XP009154166
    - VAN DER STERREN W., "Tactical Path-Finding with A*", GAME PROGRAMMING GEMS 3, (20020701), vol. 3, pages 294 - 306, XP009154171
    - HOOGENDOORN ET AL, "Pedestrian route-choice and activity scheduling theory and models", TRANSPORTATION RESEARCH PART B. METHODOLOGICAL, (20040101), vol. 38, no. 2, pages 169 - 190, XP009154167

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0191-2615(03)00007-9
    - HOOGENDOORN S.P. ET AL, "Microscopic Pedestrian Wayfinding and Dynamics Modelling", PEDESTRIAN AND EVACUATION DYNAMICS, (20020101), pages 123 - 154, XP009154188