Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1545263

EP1545263 - DISPOSABLE TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.09.2013
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.04.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 14.05.2014  [2014/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/45]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Former [2005/26]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HOHLBEIN, Douglas, J.
134 Reservoir Road
Hopewell, NJ 08525 / US
 [2013/09]
Former [2005/26]01 / HOHLBEIN, Douglas, J.
45 Diverty Road
Pennington, NJ 08534 / US
Representative(s)Jenkins, Peter David , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/13]Jenkins, Peter David , et al
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2008/34]Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F. , et al
Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2005/26]Winckels, J.H.F., Mr. Ir. , et al
Vereenigde, Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date03794567.204.09.2003
WO2003US27455
Priority number, dateUS20020408321P05.09.2002         Original published format: US 408321 P
[2005/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004021914
Date:18.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1545263
Date:29.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004
[2005/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1545263
Date:07.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.07.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:A46B11/00, A61C15/02
[2012/17]
Former International [2005/26]A45D44/18, A46B9/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/26]
Former [N/P]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:EINWEGZAHNBÜRSTE[2005/26]
English:DISPOSABLE TOOTHBRUSH[2005/26]
French:BROSSE À DENTS JETABLE[2012/25]
Former [2005/26]BROSSE A DENTS JETABLE
Entry into regional phase05.04.2005National basic fee paid 
05.04.2005Search fee paid 
05.04.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
05.04.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.04.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/26]
06.06.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
07.06.2006Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
24.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2012Fee for grant paid
24.09.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12185365.9  / EP2537436
EP13157819.7  / EP2614749
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.02.2011
Opposition(s)08.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
05.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
08.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
DK07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
PT07.03.2013
[2014/20]
Former [2013/37]AT07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
DK07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/35]AT07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
DK07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
DK07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
GR08.02.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/28]CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
GR08.02.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/26]CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
GR08.02.2013
Former [2013/24]CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
GR08.02.2013
Former [2013/23]CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
Former [2013/22]FI07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
Former [2013/21]SE07.11.2012
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1190643  (GIVAUDAN SA [CH]) [I] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [I]US5915868  (FRAZELL DALE M [US]) [I] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [I]US5490530  (SNOWDEN PATRICIA [US]) [I] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [I]US5476333  (MATTHEWS GEORGIANNE E [US]) [I] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [I]US1784986  (SEMON EISENBERG) [I] 1-16 * the whole document *
International search[Y]EP0481926  (OCCHETTI PIETRO [IT]);
 [Y]FR2822658  (DEMEYER GERALD [FR]);
 [Y]US5860183  (KAM BING [US])
by applicantUS6397860
 US6135274
 EP1190643
 US5915868
 US5490530
 US5476333
 US1784986
 US5393796
 US5609890
 US5390984
 US5533791