Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1547628

EP1547628 - PLASMA PURIFICATION MEMBRANE AND PLASMA PURIFICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.05.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
22.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Medical Co., Ltd.
1-105, Kanda Jinbo-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2012/35]
Former [2012/28]For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Medical Co., Ltd.
105, Kanda Jinbo-cho
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2011/19]For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Kuraray Medical Co., Ltd.
1-105, Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8101 / JP
Former [2008/17]For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Kuraray Medical Co., Ltd.
9-1, Kanda Mitoshiro-cho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8482 / JP
Former [2005/26]For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Medical Co., Ltd.
9-1, Kanda Mitoshiro-cho, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8482 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OISHI, Teruhiko
579, Miyajima
Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-0945 / JP
 [2005/26]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2009/29]von Kreisler, Alek , et al
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Former [2005/26]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Deichmannhaus am Dom, Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date03795429.412.09.2003
[2005/26]
WO2003JP11715
Priority number, dateJP2002026726612.09.2002         Original published format: JP 2002267266
JP2002026726712.09.2002         Original published format: JP 2002267267
[2005/26]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004024216
Date:25.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1547628
Date:29.06.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004
[2005/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1547628
Date:08.06.2011
Language:EN
[2011/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.03.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/18, B01D69/02
[2005/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PLASMA-REINIGUNGSMEMBRAN UND PLASMA-REINIGUNGSSYSTEM[2005/26]
English:PLASMA PURIFICATION MEMBRANE AND PLASMA PURIFICATION SYSTEM[2005/26]
French:MEMBRANE ET SYSTEME DE PURIFICATION DU PLASMA[2005/26]
Entry into regional phase02.03.2005Translation filed 
02.03.2005National basic fee paid 
02.03.2005Search fee paid 
02.03.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
02.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/26]
20.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.04.2011Fee for grant paid
21.04.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.05.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.03.2012  29.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Blumenstraße 17
80331 München / DE
 [2015/22]
Former [2015/15]
Opponent(s)01  08.03.2012  29.03.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Stolmár, Matthias, et al
Stolmár & Partner
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Blumenstraße 17
DE-80331 München / DE
Former [2012/16]
Opponent(s)01  08.03.2012    ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Stolmár, Matthias
Stolmár Scheele & Partner Patentanwälte Blumenstrasse 17
80331 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
22.03.2012No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
26.03.2012No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
16.04.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.10.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.12.2014Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition23.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0363/15
04.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
01.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.06.2011
BE08.06.2011
CY08.06.2011
CZ08.06.2011
DK08.06.2011
EE08.06.2011
FI08.06.2011
HU08.06.2011
IT08.06.2011
NL08.06.2011
RO08.06.2011
SE08.06.2011
SI08.06.2011
SK08.06.2011
TR08.06.2011
BG08.09.2011
GR09.09.2011
GB12.09.2011
IE12.09.2011
LU12.09.2011
ES19.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
FR30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
PT10.10.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT08.06.2011
BE08.06.2011
CY08.06.2011
CZ08.06.2011
DK08.06.2011
EE08.06.2011
FI08.06.2011
IT08.06.2011
NL08.06.2011
RO08.06.2011
SE08.06.2011
SI08.06.2011
SK08.06.2011
TR08.06.2011
BG08.09.2011
GR09.09.2011
GB12.09.2011
IE12.09.2011
LU12.09.2011
ES19.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
FR30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
PT10.10.2011
Former [2013/29]AT08.06.2011
BE08.06.2011
CY08.06.2011
CZ08.06.2011
DK08.06.2011
EE08.06.2011
FI08.06.2011
IT08.06.2011
NL08.06.2011
RO08.06.2011
SE08.06.2011
SI08.06.2011
SK08.06.2011
BG08.09.2011
GR09.09.2011
GB12.09.2011
IE12.09.2011
LU12.09.2011
ES19.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
FR30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
PT10.10.2011
Former [2012/10]AT08.06.2011
BE08.06.2011
CY08.06.2011
CZ08.06.2011
EE08.06.2011
FI08.06.2011
NL08.06.2011
RO08.06.2011
SE08.06.2011
SI08.06.2011
SK08.06.2011
GR09.09.2011
ES19.09.2011
PT10.10.2011
Former [2012/09]AT08.06.2011
BE08.06.2011
CY08.06.2011
CZ08.06.2011
EE08.06.2011
FI08.06.2011
NL08.06.2011
SE08.06.2011
SI08.06.2011
GR09.09.2011
ES19.09.2011
PT10.10.2011
Former [2012/05]AT08.06.2011
BE08.06.2011
CY08.06.2011
FI08.06.2011
NL08.06.2011
SE08.06.2011
SI08.06.2011
GR09.09.2011
ES19.09.2011
Former [2012/01]AT08.06.2011
CY08.06.2011
FI08.06.2011
NL08.06.2011
SE08.06.2011
SI08.06.2011
GR09.09.2011
ES19.09.2011
Former [2011/52]AT08.06.2011
CY08.06.2011
FI08.06.2011
SE08.06.2011
SI08.06.2011
GR09.09.2011
ES19.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY08.06.2011
FI08.06.2011
SE08.06.2011
SI08.06.2011
GR09.09.2011
ES19.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY08.06.2011
FI08.06.2011
SE08.06.2011
GR09.09.2011
ES19.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0264931  (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1,11,16 * page 2, line 49 - page 5, line 20 *;
 [A]EP0882494  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1,11,16 * page 2, lines 31-44 * * page 3, lines 3-47 * * page 4, lines 1-51 * * page 5, lines 4-8 *;
 [A]EP0168783  (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) [A] 1,11 * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 14 * * page 7, line 13 - page 14, line 38 *
International search[X]JP3281364B  ;
 [Y]WO8602575  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]);
 [Y]WO9614890  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP], et al);
 [Y]JPH043985B