EP1540660 - METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING AN ERROR IN WRITING TO PERSISTENT MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAY, Andrew 99 Hurst Street Oxford OX4 1HA / GB | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Brewer, Michael Robert Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Brewer, Michael Robert Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 03797616.4 | 16.09.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003JP11789 | Priority number, date | GB20020021868 | 20.09.2002 Original published format: GB 0221868 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004027615 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1540660 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1540660 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/00, G11C16/34, G11C16/10, G06F12/02, G06F17/30 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G06F11/0751 (EP,US);
G06F11/073 (EP,US);
G06F3/0619 (EP,US);
G06F3/064 (EP,US);
G06F3/0679 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG VON FEHLERN WÄHREND DES SCHREIBENS IN EINEN NICHTFLÜCHTIGEN SPEICHER | [2005/24] | English: | METHOD OF AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING AN ERROR IN WRITING TO PERSISTENT MEMORY | [2005/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LA DETECTION D'UNE ERREUR EN ECRITURE A UNE MEMOIRE PERMANENTE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.11.2007 | BE | 28.11.2007 | CH | 28.11.2007 | CY | 28.11.2007 | CZ | 28.11.2007 | DK | 28.11.2007 | EE | 28.11.2007 | FI | 28.11.2007 | LI | 28.11.2007 | NL | 28.11.2007 | RO | 28.11.2007 | SI | 28.11.2007 | SK | 28.11.2007 | TR | 28.11.2007 | BG | 28.02.2008 | SE | 28.02.2008 | GR | 29.02.2008 | ES | 11.03.2008 | PT | 28.04.2008 | HU | 29.05.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CY | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
HU | 29.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CY | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 28.11.2007 | |
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 28.11.2007 | |
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0398545 (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1-31* abstract *; | [A]EP0834882 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-31 * column 2, line 5 - line 28 *; | [A]WO0068794 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * page 2 - page 6 *; | [A]US6412080 (FLEMING MICHAEL K [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 6 *; | [A]EP1241677 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-31 * figures 12A-13D * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0104] * |