blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1575386

EP1575386 - PRODUCT CHANGE METHOD FOR A CIGARETTE MANUFACTURING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  08.02.2013
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Change: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.D SOCIETÀ PER AZIONI
Via Battindarno, 91
40133 Bologna / IT
[2006/25]
Former [2005/38]For all designated states
G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI
Via Battindarno, 91
40133 Bologna / IT
Inventor(s)01 / MANSERVIGI, Alberto
Via Vallescura, 41
I-40100 BOLOGNA / IT
02 / PARESCHI, Cristina
Via Olimpia Morata, 19
I-44100 FERRARA / IT
 [2005/38]
Representative(s)Jorio, Paolo, et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Jorio, Paolo, et al
STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9
10121 Torino / IT
Former [2005/38]Jorio, Paolo, et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date03799567.715.12.2003
[2005/38]
WO2003EP51004
Priority number, dateIT2002BO0079016.12.2002         Original published format: IT BO20020790
[2005/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2004054393
Date:01.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1575386
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1575386
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.08.2004
ClassificationIPC:A24C5/18
[2005/38]
CPC:
A24C5/18 (EP,US); A24C5/39 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PRODUKTAUSWECHSLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE ZIGARETTENHERSTELLUNGSMASCHINE[2005/38]
English:PRODUCT CHANGE METHOD FOR A CIGARETTE MANUFACTURING MACHINE[2005/38]
French:PROCEDE DE CHANGEMENT DE PRODUIT POUR UNE MACHINE DE FABRICATION DE CIGARETTES[2005/38]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2005National basic fee paid 
24.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/38]
21.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2006Fee for grant paid
19.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.02.2007    ADMISSIBLE
Hauni Maschinenbau AG
Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8 - 32
21033 Hamburg / DE
 [2007/14]
25.04.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.10.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
16.08.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.08.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.08.2012Date of oral proceedings
01.08.2012Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
01.08.2012Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/11]
01.08.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
26.11.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition18.10.2010Appeal received No.  T2133/10
24.12.2010Statement of grounds filed
01.08.2012Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
13.10.2010Appeal received No.  T2133/10
17.12.2010Statement of grounds filed
01.08.2012Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CY21.06.2006
CZ21.06.2006
EE21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
RO21.06.2006
SI21.06.2006
SK21.06.2006
TR21.06.2006
BG21.09.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
IE15.12.2006
LU15.12.2006
HU22.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CZ21.06.2006
EE21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
RO21.06.2006
SI21.06.2006
SK21.06.2006
TR21.06.2006
BG21.09.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
IE15.12.2006
LU15.12.2006
HU22.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/32]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CZ21.06.2006
EE21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
RO21.06.2006
SI21.06.2006
SK21.06.2006
BG21.09.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
IE15.12.2006
HU22.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/31]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CZ21.06.2006
EE21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
RO21.06.2006
SI21.06.2006
SK21.06.2006
BG21.09.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
IE15.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/28]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CZ21.06.2006
EE21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
RO21.06.2006
SI21.06.2006
SK21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
IE15.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2008/21]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CZ21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
RO21.06.2006
SI21.06.2006
SK21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
GR22.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
IE15.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/49]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CZ21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
RO21.06.2006
SI21.06.2006
SK21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
IE15.12.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/41]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CZ21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
IT21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
RO21.06.2006
SI21.06.2006
SK21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
MC31.12.2006
Former [2007/22]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CZ21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
SI21.06.2006
SK21.06.2006
DK21.09.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/20]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CZ21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
NL21.06.2006
SI21.06.2006
SK21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/14]AT21.06.2006
BE21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
CZ21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
SI21.06.2006
SK21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
ES02.10.2006
PT21.11.2006
Former [2007/03]AT21.06.2006
CH21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
LI21.06.2006
SI21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
Former [2007/01]AT21.06.2006
FI21.06.2006
SE21.09.2006
Former [2006/49]SE21.09.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]GB952077  (IAN MELVILLE CLARK M A) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]GB2088693  (SASIB SPA) [A] 1* abstract *;
 [A]US4756315  (MATTEI RICCARDO [IT], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.