Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1581753

EP1581753 - A TWO-ARM BELT TENSIONER FOR A BELT DRIVE AND A BELT DRIVE WITH A TENSIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/40]A TWO-ARM BELT TENSIONER FOR A BELT DRIVE
[2009/29]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.2010
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dayco Europe S.r.l. con Unico Socio
Via Papa Leone XIII, 45 Frazione Chieti Scalo
Chieti / IT
[2010/01]
Former [2005/40]For all designated states
Dayco Europe S.r.l. con Unico Socio
Via Papa Leone XIII, 45
66013 Chieti / IT
Inventor(s)01 / LOLLI, Sergio
Via San Giuliano, 5
63100 Ascoli Piceno / IT
02 / D'AMICANTONIO, Luca, c/o Dayco Europe S.r.l.
Stradale Torino, 603
10090 San Bernardo Di Ivrea / IT
 [2005/40]
Representative(s)Jorio, Paolo , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Jorio, Paolo , et al
STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9
10121 Torino / IT
Former [2005/40]Jorio, Paolo , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date03799604.829.12.2003
[2005/40]
WO2003EP51112
Priority number, dateIT2002TO0113330.12.2002         Original published format: IT TO20021133
[2005/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004059192
Date:15.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1581753
Date:05.10.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004
[2005/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1581753
Date:27.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:F16H7/12
[2005/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:RIEMENSPANNER MIT ZWEI ARMEN FÜR RIEMENGETRIEBE UND RIEMENGETRIEBE MIT EINEM RIEMENSPANNER[2009/29]
English:A TWO-ARM BELT TENSIONER FOR A BELT DRIVE AND A BELT DRIVE WITH A TENSIONER[2009/29]
French:TENDEUR DE COURROIE A DEUX BRAS DESTINE A UN ENTRAINEMENT DE COURROIE ET UN ENTRAINEMENT DE COURROIE AVEC TENDEUR[2009/29]
Former [2005/40]RIEMENSPANNER MIT ZWEI ARMEN FÜR RIEMENGETRIEBE
Former [2005/40]A TWO-ARM BELT TENSIONER FOR A BELT DRIVE
Former [2005/40]TENDEUR DE COURROIE A DEUX BRAS DESTINE A UN ENTRAINEMENT DE COURROIE
Entry into regional phase29.07.2005National basic fee paid 
29.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/40]
14.07.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2009Fee for grant paid
20.11.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
16.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
17.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.01.2010
BE27.01.2010
CY27.01.2010
CZ27.01.2010
DK27.01.2010
EE27.01.2010
FI27.01.2010
NL27.01.2010
RO27.01.2010
SE27.01.2010
SI27.01.2010
SK27.01.2010
TR27.01.2010
BG27.04.2010
GR28.04.2010
ES08.05.2010
PT27.05.2010
HU28.07.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/42]AT27.01.2010
BE27.01.2010
CY27.01.2010
CZ27.01.2010
DK27.01.2010
EE27.01.2010
FI27.01.2010
NL27.01.2010
RO27.01.2010
SE27.01.2010
SI27.01.2010
SK27.01.2010
BG27.04.2010
GR28.04.2010
ES08.05.2010
PT27.05.2010
HU28.07.2010
Former [2011/07]AT27.01.2010
BE27.01.2010
CY27.01.2010
CZ27.01.2010
DK27.01.2010
EE27.01.2010
FI27.01.2010
NL27.01.2010
RO27.01.2010
SE27.01.2010
SI27.01.2010
SK27.01.2010
BG27.04.2010
GR28.04.2010
ES08.05.2010
PT27.05.2010
Former [2010/51]AT27.01.2010
BE27.01.2010
CY27.01.2010
CZ27.01.2010
EE27.01.2010
FI27.01.2010
NL27.01.2010
RO27.01.2010
SE27.01.2010
SI27.01.2010
SK27.01.2010
BG27.04.2010
GR28.04.2010
ES08.05.2010
PT27.05.2010
Former [2010/49]AT27.01.2010
BE27.01.2010
CY27.01.2010
CZ27.01.2010
EE27.01.2010
FI27.01.2010
NL27.01.2010
RO27.01.2010
SE27.01.2010
SI27.01.2010
SK27.01.2010
GR28.04.2010
ES08.05.2010
PT27.05.2010
Former [2010/38]AT27.01.2010
FI27.01.2010
NL27.01.2010
SI27.01.2010
ES08.05.2010
PT27.05.2010
Former [2010/36]AT27.01.2010
NL27.01.2010
SI27.01.2010
ES08.05.2010
PT27.05.2010
Former [2010/35]AT27.01.2010
NL27.01.2010
ES08.05.2010
PT27.05.2010
Former [2010/32]AT27.01.2010
ES08.05.2010
Former [2010/30]AT27.01.2010
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO0077422  (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG ;BOGNER MICHAEL (DE)) [X] 1,7,8 * figure - * * page 12, line 5 * [Y] 3-6;
 [Y]US4906222  (HENDERSON DEWEY D) [Y] 3,4,6 * figure - *;
 [Y]US5919107  (STEPNIAK JACEK) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 19 *;
 [PX]WO03050433  (DAYCO PRODUCTS LLC) [PX] 1-3,5,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]CH148573  (TUESCHER & CO GEB) [A] 1,2 * page 2, column 1, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]WO0229279  (GATES CORP) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * page 13, line 27 *;
 [A]DE19631507  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG) [A] 3,4 * figure - *;
 [A]US5575727  (NOVAK DAVID B ET AL) [A] 3,4 * figure - *;
 [A]US4758208  (BARTOS ANDREW L ET AL) [A] 1,7 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19926613  (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH09177911  ;
 [A]US2002086751  (BERGER RUDOLF ET AL)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09177911 A 19970711 (NIPPON SEIKO KK) [A] 5 * abstract *