Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1573170

EP1573170 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CIRCULATING FLUID IN A WELL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CDX Gas, LLC
5485 Beltline Road, Suite 190
Dallas, TX 75254-7672 / US
[2009/08]
Former [2005/37]For all designated states
CDX Gas, LLC
5485 Beltline Road, Suite 190
Dallas, TX 75254-7672 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZUPANICK, Joseph, A.
Post Office Box 1797
Pineville, WV 24874 / US
 [2005/37]
Representative(s)Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/37]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date03799866.302.12.2003
[2005/37]
WO2003US38383
Priority number, dateUS2002032319218.12.2002         Original published format: US 323192
[2005/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004061267
Date:22.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1573170
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004
[2005/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1573170
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:E21B43/30, E21B21/08, E21B21/14, E21B43/00
[2005/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM ZIRKULIEREN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN IN BOHRLOCHSYSTEMEN[2005/37]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CIRCULATING FLUID IN A WELL SYSTEM[2005/37]
French:PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE CIRCULATION DE FLUIDE DANS UN SYSTEME DE PUITS[2005/37]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2005National basic fee paid 
07.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
18.05.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/37]
03.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.2008Fee for grant paid
17.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/31]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/14]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/49]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2010/08]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/50]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/43]AT18.02.2009
BE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/36]FI18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
ES29.05.2009
Former [2009/35]NL18.02.2009
ES29.05.2009
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2002148613  (ZUPANICK JOSEPH A [US]) [X] 60-62,64-70,72-75,86-88 * paragraph [0040]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0037]; figure 1 * [Y] 1-59;
 [Y]US3385382  (CANALIZO CARLOS R, et al) [Y] 1-59 * column 3, line 30 - line 53 * * column 6, line 24 - line 40; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3208537  (SCARBOROUGH WILLIAM E) [A] 1-88 * column 2, line 31 - line 35; figure 1 *