Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1583798

EP1583798 - POLYESTER-POLYCARBONATE BLENDS USEFUL FOR EXTRUSION BLOW-MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.09.2008
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY
100 North Eastman Road
Kingsport TN 37660 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/41]For all designated states
EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY
100 North Eastman Road
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PECORINI, Thomas, Joseph
208 Remington Court
Kingsport, TN 37663 / US
02 / DOBBS, Harold, Eugene
304 High Ridge Road
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
03 / GILLIAM, Spencer, Allen
905 Lane Drive
Kingsport, TN 37660 / US
04 / HALE, Wesley, Raymond
801 Wood Court
Kingsport, TN 37663 / US
 [2005/41]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/41]Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date03799991.917.12.2003
[2005/41]
WO2003US40442
Priority number, dateUS20030439681P13.01.2003         Original published format: US 439681 P
US2003073751316.12.2003         Original published format: US 737513
[2005/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004069931
Date:19.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1583798
Date:12.10.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004
[2005/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1583798
Date:31.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/44]
Search report(s)International search reportEP19.08.2004
ClassificationInternational:C08L67/02, C08L69/00, B29C49/04, B29C49/00
[2005/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MISCHUNGEN VON POLYESTER UND POLYCARBONAT FÜR EXTRUSIONSBLASVERFAHREN[2005/41]
English:POLYESTER-POLYCARBONATE BLENDS USEFUL FOR EXTRUSION BLOW-MOLDING[2005/41]
French:MELANGES DE POLYESTER-POLYCARBONATE UTILISES DANS LE MOULAGE PAR EXTRUSION-SOUFFLAGE[2005/41]
Entry into regional phase23.06.2005National basic fee paid 
23.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.08.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/41]
24.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2007Fee for grant paid
05.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
EE31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
TR31.10.2007
IE17.12.2007
LU17.12.2007
IT31.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
HU01.05.2008
[2011/12]
Former [2009/43]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
EE31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
TR31.10.2007
IE17.12.2007
LU17.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
HU01.05.2008
Former [2009/40]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
EE31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
IE17.12.2007
LU17.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2009/35]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
EE31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
IE17.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2009/11]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
EE31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
IE17.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/48]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
IE17.12.2007
MC31.12.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/39]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
RO31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
SK31.10.2007
MC31.12.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/35]AT31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CZ31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
MC31.12.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/33]AT31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
MC31.12.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/26]CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SI31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
BG31.01.2008
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]US5283295  (LIGHT RONALD R [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12-15,17,21-26,29 * example all; claims 1,2 *;
 [X]US5420212  (LIGHT RONALD R [US]) [X] 1,12,17,21,23-26,29 * example all; claims 1,10 *;
 [X]JPH11100451  ;
 [A]US5442036  (BEAVERS RANDY S [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * column 5, lines 20-40; claim 1 *;
 [X]US5254610  (SMALL JR JAMES D [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 2; claim 1 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, [X] 1-4 * abstract *