Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1583845

EP1583845 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MOLECULAR ANALYSIS IN SMALL SAMPLE VOLUMES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.07.2009
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 05.08.2009  [2009/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bioforce Nanosciences, Inc.
2901 South Loop Drive
Ames, IA 50010 / US
[2005/41]
Inventor(s)01 / HENDERSON, Eric
1615 Golden Aspen Drive Suite 101
Ames, IA 50010-8098 / US
02 / MOSHER, Curtis
601 Garden Road
Ames, IA 50010 / US
03 / HUFF, Janice
10802 Rampart Street
Housten, TX 77096 / US
 [2007/07]
Former [2005/41]01 / HENDERSON, Eric
2807 Torrey Pines Road
Ames, IA 50014 / US
02 / MOSHER, Curtis
601 Garden Road
Ames, IA 50010 / US
03 / HUFF, Janice
5408 Clemens Boulevard
Ames, IA 50014 / US
Representative(s)Watson, Robert James , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/41]Watson, Robert James , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date03800411.530.12.2003
[2005/41]
WO2003US41770
Priority number, dateUS20030437674P02.01.2003         Original published format: US 437674 P
[2005/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004060044
Date:22.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1583845
Date:12.10.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004
[2005/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.10.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, B01J19/00, G01N33/53, C12M1/26, C12M3/00, G01B7/34, G01N13/16
[2006/25]
Former International [2005/41]C12Q1/68
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MOLEKULAREN ANALYSE BEI KLEINEN PROBENVOLUMEN[2005/41]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MOLECULAR ANALYSIS IN SMALL SAMPLE VOLUMES[2005/41]
French:METHODE ET APPAREIL POUR UNE ANALYSE MOLECULAIRE DANS DE PETITS VOLUMES D'ECHANTILLON[2005/41]
Entry into regional phase26.07.2005National basic fee paid 
26.07.2005Search fee paid 
26.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/41]
19.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.04.2009
16.03.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/32]
29.03.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/32]
27.04.2009Date of oral proceedings
27.04.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XDA]US2002123135  (HENDERSON ERIC [US], et al) [XD] 1-3,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 4-11,14-27;
 [XA]US2001044106  (HENDERSON ERIC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,11-13 * [0044]-[0070], [0092]-[0102] * [A] 4,5,9,10,14-27;
 [XA]US2002164656  (HOEFFLER JAMES P [US], et al) [X] 14-16,27 * [0011], Examples, claims * [A] 1-13,15-26;
 [XA]US6395562  (HAMMOCK BRUCE D [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,12,13 * columns 1-6 * [A] 2,4,5,7-11,14-27;
 [YDA]WO0231183  (BIOFORCE LAB INC [US], et al) [YD] 4,17 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,5-16,18-27;
 [XPA]US2003228695  (NAKAMURA CHIKASHI [JP], et al) [XP] 1-3,5,9,10,12,13,23-26 * the whole document * [AP] 4,6-8,11,14-22,27;
 [A]EP1063287  (KARUBE ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 9 * figures 3,5-7 * * the whole document *;
 [XAY]  - NISHIDA SHUHEI ET AL, "Combination of AFM with an objective-type total internal reflection fluorescence microscope (TIRFM) for nanomanipulation of single cells.", ULTRAMICROSCOPY. MAY 2002, (200205), vol. 91, no. 1-4, ISSN 0304-3991, pages 269 - 274, XP002377190 [X] 1,9,10,12,13,23-26 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,5-8,11,14-16,18-22,27 [Y] 4,17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3991(02)00108-0
 [XAY]  - VO-DINH T ET AL, "Antibody-based nanoprobe for measurement of a fluorescent analyte in a single cell.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY. JUL 2000, (200007), vol. 18, no. 7, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 764 - 767, XP002377191 [X] 1-3,9,10,12,13,18,27 * the whole document * [A] 5-8,11,14-16,19-26 [Y] 4,17

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/77337
 [XA]  - MCKENDRY RACHEL ET AL, "Multiple label-free biodetection and quantitative DNA-binding assays on a nanomechanical cantilever array.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. 23 JUL 2002, (20020723), vol. 99, no. 15, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9783 - 9788, XP002377192 [X] 1-3,5,12,13,22 * the whole document * [A] 4,6-11,14-21,23-27

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.152330199
 [XA]  - PEREIRA R S, "Atomic force microscopy as a novel pharmacological tool.", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY. 15 OCT 2001, (20011015), vol. 62, no. 8, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 975 - 983, XP002377193 [X] 1-3,5,9,10,12,13,22 * the whole document * [A] 4,6-8,11,14-21,23-27
 [XA]  - LI S ET AL, "Regression of tumors by IFN-a electroporation gene therapy and analysis of the responsible genes by cDNA array", GENE THERAPY, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD., BASINGSTOKE, GB, (200203), vol. 9, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 390 - 397, XP002904771 [X] 14 * page 395, column 2 * [A] 1-13,15-27

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3301645
 [XA]  - WU G ET AL, "Origin of nanomechanical cantilever motion generated from biomolecular interactions.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. 13 FEB 2001, (20010213), vol. 98, no. 4, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1560 - 1564, XP002377194 [X] 1,3,5,12,13 * figures 1-4 * * the whole document * [A] 2,4,6-11,14-27

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.031362498
 [A]  - "FluoSpheres Fluorescent Microspheres - Product information", MOLECULAR PROBES, INVITROGEN DETECTION TECHNOLOGIES, URL: http://probes.invitrogen.com/media/pis/mp05000.pdf, XP002378381 [A] 1-27
 [A]  - DAMMER U ET AL, "Specific antigen/antibody interactions measured by force microscopy.", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL. MAY 1996, (199605), vol. 70, no. 5, ISSN 0006-3495, pages 2437 - 2441, XP002377195 [A] 1-27 * the whole document *
 [A]  - "Finding new uses for carbon nanofibers", OAK RIDGE NATIONAL LABORATORY, vol. 35, no. 3, (2002), URL: http://www.ornl.gov/info/ornlreview/v35_3_02/improving.shtml, XP002377196 [A] 1-27 * the whole document *
 [A]  - REBECCA HOWLAND, LISA BENATAR, "A practical guide to scanning probe microscopy", THERMOMICROSCOPES, (2002), URL: http://web.mit.edu/cortiz/www/AFMGallery/PracticalGuide.pdf, XP002377197 [A] 1-27 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5304487  (WILDING PETER [US], et al);
 [A]US5804445  (BRASIER ALLAN R [US]);
 [A]US6210910  (WALT DAVID R [US], et al)