Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1550046

EP1550046 - COMPACT GALOIS FIELD MULTIPLIER ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.05.2011
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Analog Devices, Inc.
Three Technology Way
Norwood, Massachusetts 02062 / US
[2010/28]
Former [2005/27]For all designated states
Analog Devices, Inc.
Three Technology Way
Norwood, Massachusetts 02062 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STEIN, Yosef
4 Turning Mill Road
Sharon, MA 02067 / US
02 / KABLOTSKY, Joshua, A.
99 Nickels Lane
Carlisle, MA 01741 / US
 [2007/17]
Former [2005/27]01 / STEIN, Yosef
4 Turning Mill Road
Sharon, MA 02067 / US
02 / KABLOTSKY, Joshua, A.
2191 Bay Road
Sharon, MA 02067 / US
Representative(s)Beck, Simon Antony , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/39]Beck, Simon Antony , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2005/27]Jones, Graham H.
Graham Jones & Company Blackheath 77 Beaconsfield Road
London SE3 7LG / GB
Application number, filing date03808174.109.10.2003
[2005/27]
WO2003US31886
Priority number, dateUS20020417384P09.10.2002         Original published format: US 417384 P
US2003039562024.03.2003         Original published format: US 395620
[2005/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004034207
Date:22.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/17]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1550046
Date:06.07.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004
[2005/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1550046
Date:14.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.07.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F7/72
[2010/01]
Former International [2006/39]G06F7/72, H03M13/15
Former International [2005/27]G06F15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/27]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMPAKTE GALOISFELD-MULTIPLIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2010/01]
English:COMPACT GALOIS FIELD MULTIPLIER ENGINE[2005/27]
French:DISPOSITIF COMPACT DE MULTIPLICATION SUR UN CHAMPS DE GALOIS[2010/01]
Former [2005/27]KOMPAKT-GALOISFELD-MULTIPLIKATOR-ENGINER
Former [2005/27]MOTEUR DE MULTIPLICATEUR A CORPS DE GALOIS COMPACT
Entry into regional phase08.04.2005National basic fee paid 
08.04.2005Search fee paid 
08.04.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.2005Examination requested  [2005/27]
07.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.12.2009
09.12.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2010Fee for grant paid
06.05.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.04.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
17.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
CZ14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
EE14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
IT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
RO14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
SK14.07.2010
TR14.07.2010
IE09.10.2010
LU09.10.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
CH31.10.2010
LI31.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
FR02.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
HU15.01.2011
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
CZ14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
EE14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
IT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
RO14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
SK14.07.2010
IE09.10.2010
LU09.10.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
CH31.10.2010
LI31.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
FR02.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
HU15.01.2011
Former [2012/42]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
CZ14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
EE14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
IT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
RO14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
SK14.07.2010
IE09.10.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
CH31.10.2010
LI31.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
FR02.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
HU15.01.2011
Former [2011/47]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
CZ14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
EE14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
IT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
RO14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
SK14.07.2010
IE09.10.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
CH31.10.2010
LI31.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
FR02.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/35]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
CZ14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
EE14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
IT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
RO14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
SK14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
CH31.10.2010
LI31.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
FR02.11.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/31]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
CZ14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
EE14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
IT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
RO14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
SK14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
ES25.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/24]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
CZ14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
EE14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
SK14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/23]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
CZ14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
EE14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
SK14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/19]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
DK14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/16]AT14.07.2010
BE14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/15]AT14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SE14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
GR15.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/13]AT14.07.2010
CY14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/12]AT14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
BG14.10.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/10]AT14.07.2010
FI14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
SI14.07.2010
PT15.11.2010
Former [2011/08]AT14.07.2010
NL14.07.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]US6175945  (OKITA SHIGERU [JP]) [X] 1-57 * abstract * * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 20 * * column 9, line 38 - column 13, line 61 * * figures 3,5 *;
 [X]US4251875  (MARVER JAMES M, et al) [X] 1-57 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - line 38 * * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 36 * * figure 2 *;
 [X]US5768168  (IM JIN-HYEOK [KR]) [X] 1-57 * abstract * * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 41 * * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 63 * * column 9, line 30 - line 44 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]EP1071008  (ST MICROELECTRONICS SA [FR]) [A] 1-57 * abstract * * column 4, line 47 - column 6, line 44 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5046037  (COGNAULT MARC [FR], et al) [A] 1-57 * abstract * * figures 1,6,7 *
International search[X]US5768168  (IM JIN-HYEOK [KR]);
 [X]US5999959  (WENG LIH-JYH [US], et al);
 [Y]US5754563  (WHITE PHILIP E [US])
by applicantUS5768168
 US5046037