Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1574822

EP1574822 - DEVICE FOR TELEMONITORING THE STATE OF AERIAL POWER LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/37]DEVICE FOR TELEMONITORING THE STATE OF AERIAL POWER LINES (VARIANTS)
[2007/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2009
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 08.12.2010  [2010/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mekhanoshin, Boris Losifovitch
Shenkursky prozed, 10-B-17
Moscow, 127349 / RU
For all designated states
Shkaptsov, Vladimir Aleksandrovitch
Leningradskoe shosse, 15-177
Moscow, 125171 / RU
[2008/17]
Former [2005/37]For all designated states
Mekhanoshin, Boris Iosifovitch
Shenkursky poezd, 10-V-17
Moscow, 127349 / RU
For all designated states
Shkaptsov, Vladimir Aleksandrovitch
Leningradskoe shosse, 15-177
Moscow, 125171 / RU
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2005/37]
Representative(s)Jeck, Anton
Jeck & Fleck
Patentanwälte
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Jeck, Anton
Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
Former [2005/37]Jeck, Anton
Patentanwalt, Klingengasse 2/1
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
Application number, filing date03809903.230.10.2003
[2005/37]
WO2003RU00460
Priority number, dateRU2002012916031.10.2002         Original published format: RU 2002129160
[2005/37]
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004040239
Date:13.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1574822
Date:14.09.2005
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004
[2005/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1574822
Date:23.04.2008
Language:DE
[2008/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU13.05.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:G01D5/12, G08C17/00, G01R15/14
[2005/50]
Former International [2005/37]G01D5/12, G08C17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/37]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR FERNÜBERWACHUNG DES ZUSTANDS VON ÜBERLANDLEITUNGEN[2007/44]
English:DEVICE FOR TELEMONITORING THE STATE OF AERIAL POWER LINES[2007/44]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE A DISTANCE DE L'ETAT DE LIGNES AERIENNES DE TRANSPORT D'ELECTRICITE[2007/44]
Former [2005/37]EINRICHTUNG ZUR FERNÜBERWACHUNG DESZUSTANDS VON ÜBERLANDLEITUNGEN (VARIANTEN)
Former [2005/37]DEVICE FOR TELEMONITORING THE STATE OF AERIAL POWER LINES (VARIANTS)
Former [2005/37]DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE A DISTANCE DE L'ETAT DE LIGNES AERIENNES DE TRANSPORT D'ELECTRICITE (VARIANTES)
Entry into regional phase30.05.2005Translation filed 
31.05.2005National basic fee paid 
31.05.2005Search fee paid 
31.05.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU
31.05.2005Examination requested  [2005/37]
01.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2008Fee for grant paid
06.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY23.04.2008
CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
TR23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
GR24.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
HU24.10.2008
AT30.10.2008
GB30.10.2008
LU30.10.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
[2010/49]
Former [2010/37]CY23.04.2008
CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
TR23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
HU24.10.2008
AT30.10.2008
GB30.10.2008
LU30.10.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
Former [2010/34]CY23.04.2008
CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
HU24.10.2008
AT30.10.2008
GB30.10.2008
LU30.10.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
Former [2010/32]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
AT30.10.2008
GB30.10.2008
LU30.10.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
Former [2010/08]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
AT30.10.2008
GB30.10.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
Former [2010/01]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
GB30.10.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
Former [2009/50]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
BE31.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
Former [2009/43]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
BE31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
Former [2009/40]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
IT23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
MC31.10.2008
Former [2009/26]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
MC31.10.2008
Former [2009/22]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
EE23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/14]CZ23.04.2008
DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
RO23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
SK23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/08]DK23.04.2008
FI23.04.2008
IE23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2009/07]FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
SE23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2008/49]FI23.04.2008
NL23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
PT23.09.2008
Former [2008/48]NL23.04.2008
SI23.04.2008
BG23.07.2008
ES03.08.2008
Former [2008/47]SI23.04.2008
ES03.08.2008
Former [2008/44]SI23.04.2008
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5565783  (LAU KEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * column 10, line 13 - line 29 * * figures 1,4a,4b,10 *;
 [Y]JPH11281702  ;
 [Y]JP2002162431  ;
 [A]JPH11281700  ;
 [A]EP1099951  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 11 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5029101  (FERNANDES ROOSEVELT A [US]) [A] 1,11 * figures 4a,4b,8 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11281702 A 19991015 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021010), vol. 2002, no. 10, & JP2002162431 A 20020607 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 11-20 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11281700 A 19991015 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]RU2143165  (MOLOCHKOV VIKTOR FEDOROVICH);
 [A]US4904996  (FERNANDES ROOSEVELT A [US]);
 [A]US4420752  (DAVIS MURRAY W [US], et al);
 [A]WO9948070  (ASCOT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS LTD [GB], et al)