blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1572823

EP1572823 - OBJET PROVIDED WITH PROTECTED INFORMATION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.02.2010
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
[2005/37]
Inventor(s)01 / BEIER, Horst-Michael
Peterhofstrasse 12
86163 Augsburg / DE
02 / KOLBER, Lothar
Schneemannstrasse 2
81369 München / DE
03 / KABITOGLOU, Georgios
Bahnhofstrasse 13
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
04 / RODRIGUEZ, Gabriel
Bellavista 24
08440 Cardedeu / ES
 [2005/37]
Representative(s)Höhfeld, Jochen
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]Höhfeld, Jochen
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date03810982.311.11.2003
[2005/37]
WO2003EP12591
Priority number, dateDE200215252112.11.2002         Original published format: DE 10252521
[2005/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004044080
Date:27.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1572823
Date:14.09.2005
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1572823
Date:08.04.2009
Language:DE
[2009/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.05.2004
ClassificationIPC:C09J7/00, C09J7/02
[2005/37]
CPC:
G06K19/06046 (EP,US); Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEGENSTAND MIT ABZUSICHERNDEN INFORMATIONEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN[2005/37]
English:OBJET PROVIDED WITH PROTECTED INFORMATION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAID OBJECT[2005/37]
French:OBJET DOTE D'INFORMATIONS A PROTEGER ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT OBJET[2005/37]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2005National basic fee paid 
13.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.2004Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/37]
24.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.09.2008
19.09.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
25.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
25.09.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2009Fee for grant paid
13.02.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.01.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY08.04.2009
CZ08.04.2009
DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
IT08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SK08.04.2009
TR08.04.2009
BG08.07.2009
SE08.07.2009
GR09.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
HU09.10.2009
AT11.11.2009
GB11.11.2009
LU11.11.2009
BE30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/31]CZ08.04.2009
DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
IT08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SK08.04.2009
BG08.07.2009
SE08.07.2009
GR09.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
HU09.10.2009
AT11.11.2009
GB11.11.2009
LU11.11.2009
BE30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2011/21]CZ08.04.2009
DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
IT08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SK08.04.2009
BG08.07.2009
SE08.07.2009
GR09.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
AT11.11.2009
GB11.11.2009
LU11.11.2009
BE30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2011/14]CZ08.04.2009
DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
IT08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SK08.04.2009
BG08.07.2009
SE08.07.2009
GR09.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
AT11.11.2009
GB11.11.2009
BE30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2011/08]CZ08.04.2009
DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SK08.04.2009
BG08.07.2009
SE08.07.2009
GR09.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
AT11.11.2009
GB11.11.2009
BE30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2011/05]CZ08.04.2009
DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SK08.04.2009
BG08.07.2009
SE08.07.2009
GR09.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
GB11.11.2009
BE30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/49]CZ08.04.2009
DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SK08.04.2009
BG08.07.2009
SE08.07.2009
GR09.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
BE30.11.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/46]CZ08.04.2009
DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SK08.04.2009
BG08.07.2009
SE08.07.2009
GR09.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
CH30.11.2009
LI30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/30]CZ08.04.2009
DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SK08.04.2009
BG08.07.2009
SE08.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/18]CZ08.04.2009
DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SK08.04.2009
BG08.07.2009
SE08.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
Former [2010/10]CZ08.04.2009
DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SK08.04.2009
SE08.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
Former [2010/09]CZ08.04.2009
DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SE08.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
Former [2010/08]DK08.04.2009
EE08.04.2009
FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SE08.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
Former [2010/07]FI08.04.2009
IE08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SE08.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
Former [2009/52]FI08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
SE08.07.2009
PT08.09.2009
Former [2009/50]FI08.04.2009
NL08.04.2009
PT08.09.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH04189194  ;
 [X]US5281474  (MATSUZAKI MORIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-39 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 53 ** abstract *;
 [X]DE19529728  (TRAUTWEIN GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-39 * page 1, line 42 - page 4, line 5 * * abstract *;
 [X]DE10109964  (SCHREINER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-39 * column 1, line 61 - column 3, line 46 * * abstract *;
 [X]DE20110188U  (VKV GMBH & CO CONSULTING [DE]) [X] 1-39 * page 2, line 4 - page 4, line 24 * * abstract *;
 [PX]WO03044605  (TESA SCRIBOS GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-39 * page 2, line 13 - page 9, line 23 * * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921021), vol. 0165, no. 10, Database accession no. (M - 1328), & JP04189194 A 19920707 (SHINKOU KAGAKU KOUGIYOU KK; OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-39 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.