blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1580045

EP1580045 - UPPER MOUNT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2008
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sakamoto, Tutomu
61-1, Aota
Nagareyama-shi, Chiba 270-0112 / JP
[2005/39]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2005/39]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2005/39]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date03812360.001.12.2003
[2005/39]
WO2003JP15340
Priority number, dateJP2002034810529.11.2002         Original published format: JP 2002348105
[2005/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004050396
Date:17.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1580045
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.06.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2006
ClassificationIPC:B60G17/027
[2005/39]
CPC:
B60G17/0272 (EP,US); B60G17/027 (KR); B60G15/06 (KR);
B60G15/067 (EP,US); B60G2202/312 (EP,US); B60G2202/32 (EP,US);
B60G2202/413 (EP,US); B60G2204/128 (EP,US); B60G2206/911 (EP,US);
B60G2500/30 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OBERE BEFESTIGUNG[2005/39]
English:UPPER MOUNT[2005/39]
French:MONTURE SUPERIEURE[2005/39]
Entry into regional phase18.05.2005Translation filed 
15.06.2005National basic fee paid 
15.06.2005Search fee paid 
15.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/39]
11.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/52]
08.08.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200705   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS58407  ;
 [X]JPS58136506  ;
 [X]JPS5830811  ;
 [PX]JP2003291620  ;
 [X]DE3223195  (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure . *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830324), vol. 007, no. 071, Database accession no. (M - 202), & JP58000407 A 19830105 (HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KK) [X] 1-3 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831108), vol. 007, no. 250, Database accession no. (M - 254), & JP58136506 A 19830813 (SHIYOUWA SEISAKUSHO:KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830513), vol. 007, no. 110, Database accession no. (M - 214), & JP58030811 A 19830223 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,3 * abstract *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003291620 A 20031015 (AOKI MASAAKI) [PX] 1,2 * abstract *
International search[Y]JP4051054Y  ;
 [Y]JPS58149814  (NISSAN MOTOR, et al);
 [Y]JPS6118912U  ;
 [Y]JPS61159208U  ;
 [Y]JPS6327738U  ;
 [Y]JPH0260736U  ;
 [X]JPH0732835  (SHOWA AUTO ENG);
 [A]JPH10138729  (HINO MOTORS LTD);
 [AP]JP2003205722  (AOKI MASAAKI)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.