EP1579206 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR KEEPING CONSTANT THE RETENTION TIMES IN A GASCHROMATOGRAPHIC ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 13.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo Fisher Scientific S.p.A Strada Rivoltana 20090 Rodano (MI) / IT | [2009/47] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Thermo Electron S.p.A. Strada Rivoltana 20090 Rodano Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGNI, Paolo Viale Lombardia, 1 I-26010 Izano / IT | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Marietti, Andrea Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Marietti, Andrea Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/39] | Marietti, Andrea Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03812641.3 | 05.12.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003IB05706 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI02605 | 09.12.2002 Original published format: IT MI20022605 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004053478 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579206 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1579206 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/32, G01N30/86 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
G01N30/32 (EP,US);
G01N30/8668 (EP,US);
G01N2030/324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONSTANTHALTEN DER HALTEZEITEN IN EINER GASCHROMATOGRAPHIEANALYSE | [2012/04] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR KEEPING CONSTANT THE RETENTION TIMES IN A GASCHROMATOGRAPHIC ANALYSIS | [2005/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR MAINTENIR CONSTANT LES TEMPS DE SEJOUR DANS L'ANALYSE CHROMATOGRAPHIQUE EN PHASE GAZEUSE | [2005/39] |
Former [2005/39] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONSTANTHALTEN DER HALTEZEITEN INEINER GASCHROMATOGRAPHIEANALYSE | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 24.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2003 | AT | 20.06.2012 | BE | 20.06.2012 | CY | 20.06.2012 | CZ | 20.06.2012 | DK | 20.06.2012 | EE | 20.06.2012 | FI | 20.06.2012 | IT | 20.06.2012 | NL | 20.06.2012 | RO | 20.06.2012 | SE | 20.06.2012 | SI | 20.06.2012 | SK | 20.06.2012 | TR | 20.06.2012 | BG | 20.09.2012 | GR | 21.09.2012 | ES | 01.10.2012 | PT | 22.10.2012 | GB | 05.12.2012 | IE | 05.12.2012 | LU | 05.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | FR | 02.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
GB | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 05.12.2012 | ||
LU | 05.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
TR | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
GB | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
GB | 05.12.2012 | ||
IE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
IE | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
BG | 20.09.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
ES | 01.10.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
DK | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
NL | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
PT | 22.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
IT | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
CY | 20.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
RO | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SK | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
EE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 20.06.2012 | |
BE | 20.06.2012 | ||
FI | 20.06.2012 | ||
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
SI | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | ||
GR | 21.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 20.06.2012 | |
SE | 20.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0840116 (VARIAN ASSOCIATES [US]) [A] 1,8 * page 2, lines 54-56 *; | [A]EP0872732 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [A] 1,8* page 2, lines 24-27 *; | [ADX]US6036747 (BLUMBERG LEONID M [US], et al) [AD] 1-7,9,12 * the whole document * [X] 8,10,11; | [A]EP1041382 (THERMOQUEST ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018]; claim 1 *; | [A] - LEONID M. BLUMBERG, MATTHEW S. KLEE, "Method Translation and Retention Time Locking in Partition GC", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (19980915), vol. 70, no. 18, pages 3828 - 3839, XP002276489 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac971141v |