blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1580257

EP1580257 - LUBRICATING OIL ADDITIVE AND LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.01.2017  [2017/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Oil Corporation
3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8412 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
Nippon Oil Corporation
3-12, Nishi-shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8412 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAGISHITA, Kazuhiro c/o NIPPON OIL CORPORATION
8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-0815 / JP
 [2005/39]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date03813288.205.08.2003
[2005/39]
WO2003JP09953
Priority number, dateJP2002036491017.12.2002         Original published format: JP 2002364910
[2005/39]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004055140
Date:01.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1580257
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.07.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2006
ClassificationIPC:C10M159/20, C10N10/02, C10N10/04, C10N30/00, C10N30/04, C10M163/00, C10M167/00
[2006/13]
CPC:
C10M159/20 (EP,US); C10M163/00 (EP,US); C10M167/00 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US); C10M2207/026 (EP,US); C10M2207/144 (EP,US);
C10M2207/146 (EP,US); C10M2207/262 (EP,US); C10M2207/289 (EP,US);
C10M2209/103 (EP,US); C10M2215/064 (EP,US); C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2219/044 (EP,US); C10M2219/046 (EP,US); C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10N2010/02 (EP,US); C10N2010/04 (EP,US); C10N2040/48 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2005/39]C10M159/20, // (C10N10/02, 10:04, 30:00, 30:04)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHMIERÖLADDITIV UND SCHMIERÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2005/39]
English:LUBRICATING OIL ADDITIVE AND LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITION[2005/39]
French:ADDITIF POUR HUILE LUBRIFIANTE ET COMPOSITION D'HUILE LUBRIFIANTE[2005/39]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2005Translation filed 
07.07.2005National basic fee paid 
07.07.2005Search fee paid 
07.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/39]
15.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
23.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/04]
16.12.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.03.2017
14.03.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.12.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
24.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
26.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
29.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
23.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1372532  (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [X] 1-8 * example - *;
 [X]US6159911  (KATAFUCHI TADASHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * column 3, lines 18-27; claim 1; table 1 *;
 [X]US2002103088  (KATAFUCHI TADASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0030] , [0050]; claims 1,4 *;
 [E]EP1526170  (NIPPON OIL CORP [JP]) [E] 1-8 * paragraphs [0107] , [0108]; claim 1 *;
 [E]EP1526169  (NIPPON OIL CORP [JP]) [E] 1-8* paragraphs [0104] , [0105]; claim 1 *;
 [E]EP1561799  (NIPPON OIL CORP [JP]) [E] 1-8 * paragraphs [0045] , [0052]; claim 1 *
International search[Y]GB1146925  (SHELL INT RESEARCH);
 [Y]GB1184020  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]);
 [Y]WO9428095  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US], et al);
 [Y]JPH08176583  (COSMO SOGO KENKYUSHO KK, et al);
 [Y]JPH08283764  (COSMO SOGO KENKYUSHO KK, et al);
 [Y]JPH10102082  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO);
 [Y]JPH1129784  (NIPPON OIL CO LTD);
 [Y]WO0144417  (EXXONMOBIL RES & ENG CO [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.