blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1579700

EP1579700 - INTEGRATED BEAM SPLITTER AND POLARIZER FOR PROJECTION DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.10.2006  [2006/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / JANSSEN, Peter
P.O. Box 3001
Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US
 [2005/39]
Representative(s)van der Veer, Johannis Leendert
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2005/39]van der Veer, Johannis Leendert
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Prof. Holstlaan 6, Building WAH
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date03813961.411.12.2003
[2005/39]
WO2003IB06056
Priority number, dateUS20020435249P20.12.2002         Original published format: US 435249 P
[2005/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004059989
Date:15.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1579700
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.07.2004
ClassificationIPC:H04N9/31, G02B27/14, G02B6/28, G02B27/28, G02B5/30
[2005/39]
CPC:
G02B27/283 (EP); G02B5/30 (KR); G02B6/2713 (EP);
G02B6/29361 (EP); G02B6/4298 (EP); H04N9/31 (KR);
H04N9/3117 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/39]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERTER STRAHLVERZWEIGER UND POLARISIERER FÜR EIN PROJEKTIONSANZEIGESYSTEM[2006/01]
English:INTEGRATED BEAM SPLITTER AND POLARIZER FOR PROJECTION DISPLAY SYSTEM[2005/39]
French:DIVISEUR DE FAISCEAU ET POLARISEUR INTEGRES POUR SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE PAR PROJECTION[2005/39]
Former [2005/39]INTEGRIERTER STRAHLVERZWEIGER UND POLARISIERER F R EIN PROJEKTIONSANZEIGESYSTEM
Entry into regional phase20.07.2005National basic fee paid 
20.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/39]
02.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/40]
17.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/40]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200503   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US2002141058  (ITOH YOSHITAKA [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0291] - paragraph [0309]; example 21 * * figures 26-28 *;
 [A]US2002171931  (MCLEOD ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046] * * figure 6 *;
 [A]US6335782  (HOLMES RICHARD B [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 12, line 14 - line 52 * * figure 16 *;
 [A]EP0601666  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 58 * * column 8, line 43 - column 9, line 1 * * figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.