Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1587449

EP1587449 - VARYING-DIAMETER VASCULAR IMPLANT AND BALLOON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neovasc Medical Ltd.
6 Yoni Netanyahu Street
Or Yehuda 60376 / IL
[2005/43]
Inventor(s)01 / BEN-MUVHAR, Shmuel
Kibbutz Tirat Zvi
10815 Emek Beit Shean / IL
 [2005/43]
Representative(s)Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/43]Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date03813970.525.11.2003
[2005/43]
WO2003IL00996
Priority number, dateIL2002015375330.12.2002         Original published format: IL 15375302
[2005/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2004058097
Date:15.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1587449
Date:26.10.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004
[2005/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1587449
Date:25.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.08.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06, A61M25/10
[2007/01]
Former International [2005/43]A61F2/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEFÄSSIMPLANTAT UND BALLON MIT VERÄNDERLICHEM DURCHMESSER[2005/43]
English:VARYING-DIAMETER VASCULAR IMPLANT AND BALLOON[2005/43]
French:IMPLANT VASCULAIRE A DIAMETRE VARIABLE ET BALLONNET[2005/43]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2005National basic fee paid 
28.07.2005Search fee paid 
28.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/43]
25.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2008Fee for grant paid
10.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
11.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
04.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200604   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.2006
30.11.200806   M06   Fee paid on   04.02.2009
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.03.2009
CZ25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
TR25.03.2009
BG25.06.2009
LU25.11.2009
HU26.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]CZ25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
BG25.06.2009
LU25.11.2009
HU26.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2011/21]CZ25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
BG25.06.2009
IT25.11.2009
LU25.11.2009
HU26.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2011/14]CZ25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
BG25.06.2009
IT25.11.2009
HU26.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/34]CZ25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
BG25.06.2009
HU26.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/30]CZ25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
BG25.06.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/08]CZ25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
BG25.06.2009
Former [2009/50]CZ25.03.2009
EE25.03.2009
FI25.03.2009
RO25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
SK25.03.2009
Former [2009/36]FI25.03.2009
SI25.03.2009
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1254644  (PAN MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [X] 1-8,11,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0015] , [0021] * [Y] 9,10,13;
 [Y]US2002183777  (SHANNON DONALD T [US]) [Y] 9,10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0023] , [0024] , [0028] , [0042] - [0044] - [0049] , [0050] * * figures 1-5; claims 1,32 *;
 [Y]US6120534  (RUIZ CARLOS E [US]) [Y] 13 * abstract * * column 2, lines 16-21 * * column 3, lines 25-33 * * column 5, lines 25-39 * * column 6, lines 4-16 * * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 6 *;
 [A]WO9717101  (HEMODYNAMICS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 1, lines 3,4 * * page 2, columns 6-9 * * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 13 * * figures 1,2; claims 1,11 *
International search[A]US6348066