blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1576744

EP1576744 - MULTI-PROCESSOR PLATFORM FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION TERMINAL HAVING PARTITIONED PROTOCOL STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2013
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.01.2014  [2014/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Broadcom Corporation
5300 California Avenue
Irvine, CA 92617 / US
[2007/21]
Former [2005/38]For all designated states
Broadcom Corporation
16215 Alton Parkway Irvine
California 92618-7013 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HAYEM, Frederic
4070 Moratalla Terrace
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / LÖTTER, Michiel
c/o Broadcom Corporation
16215 Alton Parkway
Irvine, CA 92618-7013 / US
03 / BORROMEO, Leo
9526 Vervain St.
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
 [2013/08]
Former [2007/04]01 / HAYEM, Frederic
4070 Moratalla Terrace
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / LÖTTER, Michiel
c/o Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway
Irvine, CA 92618-7013 / US
03 / BORROMEO, Leo
9526 Vervain St.
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
Former [2005/38]01 / HAYEM, Frederic
4070 Moratalla Terrace
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / LÖTTER, Michiel
12658 Torrey Bluff Dr 277
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
03 / BORROMEO, Leo
9526 Vervain St.
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
Representative(s)Jehle, Volker Armin, et al
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/52]Jehle, Volker Armin, et al
Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Former [2008/41]Jehle, Volker Armin
Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Former [2005/38]Jehle, Volker Armin
Bosch, Graf v. Stosch, Jehle Patentanwalt GmbH Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Application number, filing date03814795.512.12.2003
[2005/38]
WO2003US39830
Priority number, dateUS20020434448P18.12.2002         Original published format: US 434448 P
[2005/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2004062137
Date:22.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1576744
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2005/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1576744
Date:20.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.07.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.2010
ClassificationIPC:H04W88/06
[2011/04]
CPC:
H04B1/406 (EP,US); H04B1/005 (US); H04B1/3818 (US);
H04B7/2618 (EP,US); H04J3/0685 (EP,US); H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W56/0015 (EP,US); H04W84/04 (EP,US); H04W84/12 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2005/38]H04B7/216, H04B7/212, H04J3/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/15]
Former [2005/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MEHRPROZESSORPLATTFORM FÜR EIN DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT MIT AUFGETEILTEM PROTOKOLLSTAPEL[2005/38]
English:MULTI-PROCESSOR PLATFORM FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION TERMINAL HAVING PARTITIONED PROTOCOL STACK[2005/38]
French:PLATE-FORME DE MULTIPROCESSEUR POUR TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL COMPORTANT UNE PILE DE PROTOCOLES CLOISONNEE[2005/38]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2005National basic fee paid 
18.07.2005Search fee paid 
18.07.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/38]
28.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2012Fee for grant paid
20.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.07.2011
Opposition(s)21.11.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
05.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0852448  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 15 - line 22 * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 45 * * figures 5,6 *;
 [XY]US6014705  (KOENCK STEVEN E [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,9 * column 3, line 22 - line 25 * * column 4, line 30 - line 43 * * column 7, line 31 - column 0, line 65 * * figures 1,1A-1C * [Y] 2-4,6,8,10;
 [XY]EP1241905  (SIEMENS INF & COMM MOBILE LLC [US]) [X] 1,5,7,9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * figures 1A,1B,2A,2B * [Y] 2-4,6,8,10;
 [A]  - WILLIE W LU, "Compact Multidimensional Broadband Wireless: The Convergence of Wireless Mobile and Access", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20001101), vol. 38, no. 11, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 117 - 123, XP011091387 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5940384  (CARNEY RONALD R [US], et al);
 [X]US6278697  (BRODY GEORGE [US], et al);
 [X]US6282184  (LEHMAN BRIAN JAMES [CA], et al);
 [AP]US6594242  (KRANSMO JAN L [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.