Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1578865

EP1578865 - POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.11.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PULPDENT CORPORATION
80 Oakland Avenue, P.O. Box 780 Watertown
MA 02471-0780 / US
[2013/47]
Former [2005/39]For all designated states
PULPDENT CORPORATION
80 Oakland Avenue, P.O. Box 780 Watertown
MA 02471-0780 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STANNARD, Jan, G.
134 Old Washington Street
Hanover, MA 02339 / US
02 / BERK, Kenneth, J.
34 Manemet Road
Newton, MA 02459 / US
 [2005/39]
Representative(s)Rupprecht, Kay , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Rupprecht, Kay , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [2005/39]Rupprecht, Kay , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date03815251.831.12.2003
[2005/39]
WO2003US41523
Priority number, dateUS2003033625503.01.2003         Original published format: US 336255
[2005/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2004063274
Date:29.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1578865
Date:28.09.2005
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004
[2005/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1578865
Date:20.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.07.2004
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.04.2006
ClassificationInternational:C08L31/00
[2005/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/39]
Extension statesAL21.06.2005
LT21.06.2005
LV21.06.2005
MK21.06.2005
TitleGerman:POLYMERISIERBARES VERBUNDMATERIAL[2005/39]
English:POLYMERIZABLE COMPOSITE MATERIAL[2005/39]
French:MATERIAU COMPOSITE POLYMERISABLE[2005/39]
Entry into regional phase21.06.2005National basic fee paid 
21.06.2005Search fee paid 
21.06.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.2005Examination requested  [2005/39]
05.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
21.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2013Fee for grant paid
24.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.02.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.08.2014  21.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
3M Deutschland GmbH
Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
Opponent's representative
Brem, Roland
3M Deutschland GmbH
OIPC
ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
 02  13.08.2014  21.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
3M Innovative Properties Co.
P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Opponent's representative
Brem, Roland, et al
3M Espe AG OIPC Espe Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
 [2016/49]
Former [2014/38]
Opponent(s)01  13.08.2014   
3M Deutschland GmbH
Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1
41453 Neuss / DE
Opponent's representative
Brem, Roland
3M Deutschland GmbH
OIPC
ESPE Platz
82229 Seefeld / DE
26.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.02.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.11.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition23.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0247/17
24.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
21.12.2010Appeal received No.  T0731/11
28.02.2011Statement of grounds filed
29.06.2012Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
11.12.2012Interlocutory revision of appeal
11.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.12.2003
AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
TR20.11.2013
IE31.12.2013
LU31.12.2013
GR21.02.2014
PT20.03.2014
[2016/28]
Former [2015/39]HU31.12.2003
AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
GR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
TR20.11.2013
IE31.12.2013
LU31.12.2013
PT20.03.2014
Former [2015/38]HU31.12.2003
AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
GR20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
TR20.11.2013
IE31.12.2013
LU31.12.2013
PT20.03.2014
Former [2015/34]HU31.12.2003
AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
TR20.11.2013
IE31.12.2013
LU31.12.2013
PT20.03.2014
Former [2015/32]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
TR20.11.2013
IE31.12.2013
PT20.03.2014
Former [2015/30]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IE31.12.2013
PT20.03.2014
Former [2015/14]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IE31.12.2013
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
IE31.12.2013
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/41]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/38]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/37]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/36]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/28]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
Former [2014/24]AT20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
Former [2014/22]FI20.11.2013
NL20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[DY]US6245872  (O. FREY) [DY] 1-14 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 8; claims 1-6 *;
 [Y]EP0356868  (DENTSPLY INTERNATIONAL, INC.) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [PY]US2003083400  (W. JIA) [PY] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4657941  (G. B. BLACKWELL) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0509516  (SANKIN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [A] 1 * claims 1-16 *
International search[A]US6315566  (SHEN BYRON CIPING [US], et al);
 [A]US6326417  (JIA WEITAO [US]);
 [A]US6500004  (JENSEN STEVEN D [US], et al);
 [A]US6653365  (JIA WEITAO [US]);
 [AP]US2003083400  (JIA WEITAO [US])
by applicantUS5264513
 EP0356868
    - J. DENT. RES., (1956), pages 846 - 851