EP1642963 - LACTOBACILLUS CASEI LC2W STRAIN AND ITS USE IN ANTIHYPERTENSIVE ASPECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Bright Dairy & Food Co. Ltd. 578 Wuhhong Road 201103 Shangai / CN | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Zhengjun 578 Wuzhong Road Shanghai 201103 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Benheng 578 Wuzhong Road Shanghai 201103 / CN | 03 /
YE, Jin 578 Wuzhong Road Shanghai 201103 / CN | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Schwahn, Hartmut Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Schwahn, Hartmut Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03817186.4 | 25.08.2003 | [2006/14] | WO2003CN00714 | Priority number, date | CN2003129450 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: CN 03129450 | [2006/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004113509 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1642963 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1642963 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, A61K35/74, A61P9/12 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
A23C19/0323 (EP);
A23L33/135 (EP);
A61K35/747 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/326, A23V2400/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DK, FR, NL [2006/39] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LACTOBACILLUS CASEI-LC2W-STAMM UND SEINE VERWENDUNG GEGEN BLUTHOCHDRUCK | [2009/09] | English: | LACTOBACILLUS CASEI LC2W STRAIN AND ITS USE IN ANTIHYPERTENSIVE ASPECT | [2006/14] | French: | SOUCHE DE LACTOBACILLUS CASEI LC2W ET SON UTILISATION CONTRE L'HYPERTENSION | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/14] | LACTOBACILLUS CASEI-LC2W-STAMM UND SEINE VERWENDUNG IN EINEM ANTI-BLUTHOCHDRUCK-ASPEKT | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2006 | Translation filed | 20.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 20.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 17.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]EP0181170 (ADVANCE KAIHATSU KENKYUSHO [JP]); | [A]JPH0525055 (YAKULT HONSHA KK); | [A]JPH0647551B ; | [A]JP2676250B |