Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1675085

EP1675085 - FLIGHT SIMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baranov, Nikolay Alekseevich
Zhulebinsky Bulvar, 40-1-100
Moscow, 109153 / RU
For all designated states
Belotserkovskiy, Andrei Sergeevich
ul. Seregina, 3, kv.42
Moscow, 125167 / RU
For all designated states
Kanevskiy, Mikhail Igorevich
Altufievskoe sh., 93-8
Moscow, 127572 / RU
For all designated states
Pasekunov, Igor Vladimirovich
Ul. Svodody, 91-1-327
Moscow, 123481 / RU
For all designated states
ZAO ROSSIYSKAYA AKTSIONERNAYA ASSOTSIATSIYA "SPETSTEKHNIKA"
ul. Zhukovskogo, 2a Dubna
Moskovskaya obl., 141980 / RU
For all designated states
FGU "FAPRID"
Ul. Vorontsovo pole, 4a
Moscow, 109028 / RU
[N/P]
Former [2011/07]For all designated states
Baranov, Nikolai Alekseevich
Zhulebinsky Bulvar, 40-1-100
Moscow, 109153 / RU
For all designated states
Belotserkovski, Andrei Sergeevich
il. Seregina, 3-42
Moscow, 125167 / RU
For all designated states
Kanevski, Mikhail Igorevich
Altufievskoe sh., 93-8
Moscow, 127572 / RU
For all designated states
Pasekunov, Igor Vladimirovich
Ul. Svodody, 91-1-327
Moscow, 123481 / RU
For all designated states
ZAO ROSSIYSKAYA AKTSIONERNAYA ASSOTSIATSIYA "SPETSTEKHNIKA"
ul. Zhukovskogo, 2a Dubna
Moskovskaya obl., 141980 / RU
For all designated states
FGU "FAPRID"
Ul. Vorontsovo pole, 4a
Moscow, 109028 / RU
Former [2010/49]For all designated states
Baranov, Nikolai Alekseevich
Zhulebinsky Bulvar, 40-1-100
Moscow, 109153 / RU
For all designated states
Belotserkovski, Andrei Sergeevich
il. Seregina, 3-42
Moscow, 125167 / RU
For all designated states
Kanevski, Mikhail Igorevich
Altufievskoe sh., 93-8
Moscow, 127572 / RU
For all designated states
Pasekunov, Igor Vladimirovich
Ul. Svodody, 91-1-327
Moscow, 123481 / RU
For all designated states
ZAKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHESTVO ROSSIYSKAYA AKTSIONERNAYA ASSOTSIATSIYA "SPETSTEKHNIKA"
ul. Zhukovskogo, 2a Dubna
Moskovskaya obl., 141980 / RU
For all designated states
FGU "FAPRID"
Ul. Vorontsovo pole, 4a
Moscow, 109028 / RU
Former [2006/26]For all designated states
Baranov, Nikolai Alekseevich
Zhulebinsky Bulvar, 40-1-100
Moscow, 109153 / RU
For all designated states
Belotserkovski, Andrei Sergeevich
il. Seregina, 3-42
Moscow, 125167 / RU
For all designated states
Kanevski, Mikhail Igorevich
Altufievskoe sh., 93-8
Moscow, 127572 / RU
For all designated states
Pasekunov, Igor Vladimirovich
Ul. Svodody, 91-1-327
Moscow, 123481 / RU
For all designated states
ZAKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHESTVO ROSSIYSKAYA AKTSIONERNAYA ASSOTSIATSIYA "SPETSTEKHNIKA"
ul. Zhukovskogo, 2a Dubna
Moskovskaya obl., 141980 / RU
For all designated states
G.U. "FEDERALNOE AGENTSTVOPO PO PRAVOVOI ZASCHITE REZULATOV INTELLEKTUALNOI DEYATELNOSTI VOENNOGO, SPETSIALNOGO I DVOINOGO NAZ
ul. Vorontsovo pole, 4
Moscow, 109028 / RU
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2006/26]
Representative(s)Jeck, Anton , et al
Jeck & Fleck
Patentanwälte
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Jeck, Anton , et al
Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
Former [2006/26]Jeck, Anton , et al
Patentanwalt, Klingengasse 2/1
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
Application number, filing date03817671.525.07.2003
[2006/26]
WO2003RU00333
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005010848
Date:03.02.2005
Language:DE
[2005/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1675085
Date:28.06.2006
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005
[2006/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU03.02.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2012
ClassificationInternational:G09B9/08
[2006/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLUGSIMULATOR[2006/26]
English:FLIGHT SIMULATOR[2006/26]
French:SIMULATEUR AERONAUTIQUE[2006/26]
Entry into regional phase24.02.2006Translation filed 
27.02.2006National basic fee paid 
27.02.2006Search fee paid 
27.02.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.02.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU
27.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/26]
12.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
25.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
25.02.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination25.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1883/16
24.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
20.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.07.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
02.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
01.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
01.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 14
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search
International search[A]RU2087037  ;
 [A]US5724040  ;
 [A]US5009598