Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1670266

EP1670266 - COMMUNICATION MODE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/24]COMMUNICATION MODE CONTROL METHOD, MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION CONTROL APPARATUS, BASE STATION, AND MOBILE COMMUNICATION TERMINAL
[2009/02]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.05.2010
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2010  [2010/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2009/27]
Former [2006/24]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / WAKABAYASHI, Hideji, c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2006/24]
Representative(s)Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/24]Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date03818820.730.09.2003
[2006/24]
WO2003JP12552
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005034545
Date:14.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1670266
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005
[2006/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1670266
Date:01.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.04.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/18, H04L29/02, H04L12/56
[2009/27]
Former International [2007/08]H04Q7/32, H04L29/02, H04L12/56
Former International [2006/24]H04Q7/32, H04L29/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/01]
Former [2006/24]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSMODUS-STEUERVERFAHREN[2009/02]
English:COMMUNICATION MODE CONTROL METHOD[2009/02]
French:PROCEDE DE REGULATION DU MODE DE COMMUNICATION[2009/02]
Former [2006/24]KOMMUNIKATIONSMODUS-STEUERVERFAHREN, MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, BASISSTATIONS-STEUERVORRICHTUNG, BASISSTATION UND MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONS-ENDGERÄT
Former [2006/24]COMMUNICATION MODE CONTROL METHOD, MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, BASE STATION CONTROL APPARATUS, BASE STATION, AND MOBILE COMMUNICATION TERMINAL
Former [2006/24]PROCEDE DE REGULATION DU MODE DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE STATION DE BASE, STATION DE BASE ET TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE
Entry into regional phase20.03.2006Translation filed 
20.03.2006National basic fee paid 
20.03.2006Search fee paid 
20.03.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/24]
24.04.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2009Fee for grant paid
08.05.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06006783.2  / EP1679933
EP06006784.0  / EP1679934
EP09006755.4  / EP2088815
EP10182078.5  / EP2271152
EP10182200.5  / EP2285156
Opposition(s)06.04.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23]
Request for further processing for:24.04.2007Request for further processing filed
24.04.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.05.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US2002172217  (KADABA SRINIVAS R [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraphs [0041] , [0043] - [0050] * * paragraphs [0051] , [0052] * * paragraphs [0076] - [0081] * * paragraph [0088] *;
 [A]  - MOTOROLA, LUCENT, "Tdoc R1-03-0592; 12.1, Enhanced Uplink DCH; Node B Controlled Time and Rate Scheduling", TSG-RAN WG1 #32 MEETING, Paris, France, (20030519), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_32/Docs/Zips/, (20070109), XP002414187 [A] 1 * 7.1.2.3 Controlling UE TFCS and transmission time; page 2, lines 8-15; Figure 1 *
 [A]  - LUCENT, "Scheduled and Autonomous Mode Operation for the Enhanced Uplink", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1#31, (20030217), pages 1 - 7, XP002298746 [A] 1 * 2 E-DCH Transmission Modes; 3 Co-existence of Scheduled and Autonomous Transmissions *
International search[Y]JP2001323656  (KANAI KK);
 [Y]JP2001016215  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [A]JP2003513534  ;
 [A]JP2002118576  (AVAYA TECHNOLOGY CORP);
 [A]JPH11239152  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE);
 [A]JP2002118585  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE)
by applicantJP2002369261
 US2002172217