blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1700506


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2012  [2012/41]
07.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.11.2011  [2011/45]
30.09.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.11.2011  [2011/44]
08.07.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2011  [2011/32]
04.03.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.04.2011  [2011/14]
05.11.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.12.2010  [2010/49]
22.01.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.02.2010  [2010/08]
18.12.2009 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.01.2010  [2010/03]
13.11.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.12.2009  [2009/51]
06.11.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2009  [2009/50]
09.10.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]
25.09.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.10.2009  [2009/44]
28.08.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.09.2009  [2009/40]
31.07.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2009  [2009/36]
24.07.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.08.2009  [2009/35]
09.01.2009 (Expected) grant published on  11.02.2009  [2009/07]
09.01.2009 Change - classification published on  11.02.2009  [2009/07]
09.01.2009 Change - classification published on  11.02.2009  [2009/07]
10.12.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.12.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.08.2008 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.05.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.02.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.01.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.10.2007 First examination report
23.10.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.03.2007 Change - extension states published on  04.04.2007  [2007/14]
10.01.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.08.2006 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.09.2006  [2006/37]
11.08.2006 Request for examination filed published on  13.09.2006  [2006/37]
02.08.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
13.07.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
09.06.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.07.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
20.07.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
16.07.2005 PCT data prior to European publication