Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1700506

EP1700506 - DYNAMIC ANTENNA CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.2009
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 10.10.2012  [2012/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2006/37]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / ASCHERMANN, Benedikt
Ilexweg 1A
42111 Wuppertal / DE
02 / VAN NIGTEVECHT, Hans
Eekmatlaan 22
NL-7534 JV Enschede / NL
03 / HAGEMAN, Halbe
Abdisstraat 83
NL-4841 HG Prinsenbeek / NL
 [2006/37]
Representative(s)Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus , et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau
P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2006/37]Dohmen, Johannes Maria Gerardus , et al
Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645
5600 AP Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date03819183.931.12.2003
[2006/37]
WO2003EP14981
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005064967
Date:14.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1700506
Date:13.09.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005
[2006/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1700506
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/00, H01Q3/26
[2009/07]
Former International [2006/37]H04Q7/36, H01Q3/26
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/37]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DYNAMISCHE ANTENNENREGELUNG[2006/37]
English:DYNAMIC ANTENNA CONTROL[2006/37]
French:COMMANDE D'ANTENNE DYNAMIQUE[2006/37]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2006National basic fee paid 
03.07.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/37]
25.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2008Fee for grant paid
01.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CY11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
TR11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
PT11.07.2009
HU12.08.2009
[2012/41]
Former [2011/44]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CY11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
TR11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
HU12.08.2009
Former [2011/32]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
HU12.08.2009
Former [2011/14]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
IT11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2010/49]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
GR12.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2010/08]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
BG11.05.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/50]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
CZ11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
EE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
RO11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SK11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/46]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
DK11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/44]AT11.02.2009
BE11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT11.02.2009
FI11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
SE11.05.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/36]FI11.02.2009
SI11.02.2009
ES22.05.2009
Former [2009/35]ES22.05.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0115477  (METAWAVE COMM CORP [US]) [X] 1-29 * page 4, line 25 - page 6, line 17 * * page 7, line 1 - line 17 * * page 11, line 28 - page 12, line 20 * * page 17, line 4 - line 22 * * page 24, line 13 - line 24 * * page 26, line 30 - page 27, line 12 * * page 28, line 15 - page 30, line 7 *
by applicantWO0101547