Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1444965

EP1444965 - Device and method for manufacturing dental prostheses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.04.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kulzer GmbH
Leipziger Strasse 2
63450 Hanau / DE
[2017/39]
Former [2005/41]For all designated states
Heraeus Kulzer GmbH
Grüner Weg 11
63450 Hanau / DE
Former [2005/02]For all designated states
Heraeus Kulzer GmbH
Heraeusstrasse 12 - 14
63450 Hanau / DE
Former [2004/33]For all designated states
Heraeus Kulzer GmbH & Co.KG
Grüner Weg 11
63450 Hanau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gärtner, Christian
Stephaniestrasse 3
17389 Greifswald / DE
02 / Kordass, Bernd, Prof. Dr. med.
Hasensprung 3
17498 Neuenkirchen / DE
 [2004/33]
Representative(s)Schultheiss & Sterzel Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Berner Strasse 52
60437 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/45]Schultheiss & Sterzel Patentanwälte
Vogelweidstraße 8
60596 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2006/50]Wolf, Jens
Patentanwalt Brahmsweg 3
30989 Gehrden / DE
Former [2004/33]Kühn, Hans-Christian
Heraeus Holding GmbH, Schutzrechte, Heraeusstrasse 12-14
63450 Hanau / DE
Application number, filing date04000286.709.01.2004
[2004/33]
Priority number, dateDE2003100475705.02.2003         Original published format: DE 10304757
[2004/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1444965
Date:11.08.2004
Language:DE
[2004/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1444965
Date:14.12.2005
[2005/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1444965
Date:11.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61C13/00
[2004/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/33]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Zahnersatz[2004/33]
English:Device and method for manufacturing dental prostheses[2004/33]
French:Dispositif et procédé de fabrication de prothèses dentaires[2004/33]
Examination procedure15.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/33]
22.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
21.03.2011Fee for grant paid
21.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.02.2012  23.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Sirona Dental Systems GmbH
Fabrikstrasse 31
64625 Bensheim / DE
 02  10.02.2012  23.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Vita Zahnfabrik H. Rauter GmbH & Co. KG
Spitalgasse 3
79713 Bad Säckingen / DE
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 [2019/49]
Former [2012/27]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2012  23.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Sirona Dental Systems GmbH
Fabrikstrasse 31
64625 Bensheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Sommer, Peter
Sommer Patentanwalt und European Patent and Trademark Attorney Augustaanlage 32
68165 Mannheim / DE
 02  10.02.2012  23.02.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Vita Zahnfabrik H. Rauter GmbH & Co. KG
Spitalgasse 3
79713 Bad Säckingen / DE
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2012/12]
Opponent(s)01  10.02.2012   
Sirona Dental Systems GmbH
Fabrikstrasse 31
64625 Bensheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Sommer, Peter
Sommer Patentanwalt und European Patent and Trademark Attorney Augustaanlage 32
68165 Mannheim / DE
 02  10.02.2012   
Vita Zahnfabrik H. Rauter GmbH & Co. KG
Spitalgasse 3
79713 Bad Säckingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm
Von Kreisler Selting Werner P.O. BOX 102241
50462 Köln / DE
03.04.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.11.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.07.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition19.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2098/16
25.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
15.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2098/16
14.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
21.03.2011Request for further processing filed
21.03.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.04.2011Decision despatched
17.11.2006Request for further processing filed
21.11.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.12.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
22.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
24.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
BG11.08.2011
GR12.08.2011
MC31.01.2012
[2013/29]
Former [2012/09]CY11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
Former [2011/50]CY11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE19828003  (ELLERBROCK CHRISTOF [DE]) [X] 7 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 67 * * column 3, lines 59-64 * * column 4, lines 15-25,54-61 * * column 4, lines 7-27 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 1-6;
 [Y]DE19532171  (AMANN DIETMAR [AT], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 60 * * column 5, lines 31-46 * * column 7, line 47 - column 9, line 21 *
ExaminationDE4025728
by applicantEP0904743
 DE19838238
 DE10107451
 DE10111704
 DE10114290
 US6152731
 US6322359