Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1447757

EP1447757 - Declarative sequenced report parameterization [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Welcker, Brian Lee
310 W. Garfield Street
Seattle Washington 98119 / US
02 / Hays, Christopher Alan
20719 Rimrock Road
Monroe Washington 98272 / US
 [2004/34]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/34]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date04001729.527.01.2004
[2004/34]
Priority number, dateUS2003036530412.02.2003         Original published format: US 365304
[2004/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1447757
Date:18.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1447757
Date:19.04.2006
[2006/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2004/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/34]
TitleGerman:Deklarative in Sequenz-Parametrisierung von Berichten[2004/34]
English:Declarative sequenced report parameterization[2004/34]
French:Paramétrage séquentiel déclaratif de rapports[2004/34]
Examination procedure12.10.2006Examination requested  [2006/47]
20.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.03.2017
30.03.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
16.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.11.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2020/01]
Appeal following examination12.07.2017Appeal received No.  T2491/17
21.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.06.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
08.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
08.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
10.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[X]US5983219  (DANISH ET AL) [X] 1-36 * abstract * * column 7, line 5 - column 9, line 22 * * column 10, line 1 - line 12 *;
 [X]US6131098  (ZELLWEGER ET AL) [X] 1-36 * column 1, line 64 - line 63; figure -; claim - * * column 4, line 35 - column 6, line 60 *;
 [X]WO0244942  (HOPKINS, MARK) [X] 1-36 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]US5261093  (ASMUTH ET AL) [X] 1-36 * figures 7,8; claims 1,2 * * column 2, line 10 - line 64 *;
 [X]EP0847019  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V) [X] 1-36 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 45; figures 1-4; claims 1-7 *;
 [X]US5787417  (HARGROVE ET AL) [X] 1-36 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - DANISH S, "Building Database-driven Electronic Catalogs", SIGMOD RECORD, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1998), vol. 27, no. 4, ISSN 0163-5808, pages 15 - 20, XP002253622 [X] 1-36 * page 19, column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/306101.306103
 [X]  - POLLITT A S ET AL, "HIBROWSE : ADDING THE POWER OF RELATIONAL DATABASES TO THE TRADITIONAL IR ARCHITECTURE - THE FUTURE FOR GRAPHIC USER INTERFACES", INFORMATION RETRIEVAL. NEW SYSTEMS AND CURRENT RESEARCH. PROCEEDINGS OF THE RESEARCH COLLOQUIUM OF THE BRITISH COMPUTER SOCIETY SYSTEMS AND CURRENT RESEARCH, (19930329), pages 108 - 118, XP008005790 [X] 1-36 * page 112, paragraph 1 - page 113, paragraph 3 * * page 115, paragraph 1; figures 4-8 *
 [X]  - KAY A, "COMPUTER SOFTWARE", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (198409), vol. 251, no. 3, ISSN 0036-8733, pages 41 - 47, XP000715884 [X] 1-36 * page 45, column M, paragraph 3 * * page 47, column 2, paragraph 1 - column 3, paragraph 1 *
 [A]  - DEGI YOUNG ET AL, "A Graphical Filter/Flow Representation of Boolean Queries: A Prototype Implementation and Evaluation", TECHNICAL REPORT CS-TR-2905, (199302), no. CS-TR-2905, pages 1 - 32, XP002210916 [A] 1-36 * page 4, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph L; figure - * * page 28, paragraph L - page 29, paragraph L; figures 1-7 *