Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1442891

EP1442891 - Inkjet printing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.09.2010
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 27.04.2011  [2011/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2009/26]
Former [2004/32]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hamasaki, Yuji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
 [2010/01]
Former [2004/32]01 / Hamasaki, Yuji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaishi
3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Weser, Wolfgang
Weser & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/32]Weser, Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date04002095.030.01.2004
[2004/32]
Priority number, dateJP2003002496831.01.2003         Original published format: JP 2003024968
[2004/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1442891
Date:04.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1442891
Date:11.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/46]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1442891
Date:17.02.2010
[2010/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP11.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175, B41J2/165
[2004/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/17]
Former [2004/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahldrucker[2004/32]
English:Inkjet printing apparatus[2004/32]
French:Imprimante à jet d'encre[2004/32]
Examination procedure04.02.2005Examination requested  [2005/14]
20.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2009Fee for grant paid
24.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09012109.6  / EP2156955
Opposition(s)12.08.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT11.11.2009
FR01.02.2010
GB11.02.2010
[2011/17]
Former [2011/14]IT11.11.2009
FR01.02.2010
Former [2010/49]FR01.02.2010
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6476926  (YANO KENTARO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-13 * column 18, line 17 - column 19, line 42; figures 13,18 * [Y] 9;
 [XA]US6318834  (OTSUKA NOBUTOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,10-13 * column 5, line 26 - column 8, line 6; figures 4-6 * [A] 3,5,9;
 [XY]JPH08174863  ;
 [A]US6142600  (TAKAHASHI KIICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 9, line 65 - column 11, line 34; figures 8,9 *;
 [A]EP1025997  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0014] - [0029]; figure 7 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, [X] 1,2,5-8,10-13 * abstract * [Y] 9