Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1477210

EP1477210 - Game apparatus and storage medium having game program recorded therein [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.05.2008
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.06.2008  [2008/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NINTENDO CO., LTD.
11-1, Hokotate-cho
Kamitoba
Minami-ku
Kyoto 601-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/28]For all designated states
Nintendo Co., Limited
11-1, Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba Minami-ku
Kyoto 601-8501 / JP
Former [2004/47]For all designated states
Nintendo Co., Limited
11-1, Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba
Minami-ku, Kyoto 601-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Bando, Taro
Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1, Hokotate-cho Kamitoba
Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP
 [2004/47]
Representative(s)Altenburg, Udo
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/47]Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys.
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date04003005.811.02.2004
[2004/47]
Priority number, dateJP2003012543430.04.2003         Original published format: JP 2003125434
[2004/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1477210
Date:17.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1477210
Date:22.06.2005
[2005/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1477210
Date:11.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/00
[2004/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/11]
Former [2004/47]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Spielgerät und Speichermedium mit darauf gespeichertem Spielprogramm[2004/47]
English:Game apparatus and storage medium having game program recorded therein[2004/47]
French:Appareil de jeu et support d'enregistrement dans lequel est stocké le programme de jeu[2004/47]
Examination procedure27.07.2005Examination requested  [2005/38]
09.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2007Fee for grant paid
23.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US5734726  (TRUCHSESS JOSEPH F [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 40 - line 48; figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 59 - line 61 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 1 - line 3 * * column 2, line 29 - line 33 * * column 2, line 43 - line 49 * * column 2, line 54 - line 55 * * column 2, line 66 * * column 3, line 42 - line 45 * * column 4, line 13 - line 50; claims 1,3,5,6,8,9,11-15 *;
 [A]JPH08292785  ;
 [A]WO0211838  (MATTEL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 14 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, [A] 1-20 * abstract *