Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1450144

EP1450144 - Method and device for digital protection of measured values [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2017New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schenck Process Europe GmbH
Pallaswiesenstraße 100
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2016/47]
Former [2004/35]For all designated states
Schenck Process GmbH
Landwehrstrasse 55
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rauchschwalbe, Ulrich
Andreasgasse 5
64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE
02 / Henhapl, Birgit, Dr.
Am Erlenberg 24
64354 Reinheim / DE
03 / Wiesmaier, Alex
Nieder-Ramstädter Strasse 183A
64285 Darmstadt / DE
04 / Ludwig, Christoph
Heidelberger Strasse 205
64285 Darmstadt / DE
05 / Ruppert, Markus
Odenwaldstrasse 40
64297 Darmstadt / DE
06 / Buchmann, Johannes, Prof. Dr.
Heinrich-Delp-Strasse 142A
64297 Darmstadt / DE
 [2005/24]
Former [2004/35]01 / RAUCHSCHWALBE, Ulrich
Andreasgasse 5
64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/40]
Former [2004/35]Behrens, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Gross-Gerauer Weg 55
64295 Darmstadt / DE
Application number, filing date04003857.220.02.2004
[2004/35]
Priority number, dateDE200310809224.02.2003         Original published format: DE 10308092
[2004/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1450144
Date:25.08.2004
Language:DE
[2004/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1450144
Date:26.07.2006
[2006/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP23.06.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/32, G01G23/01
[2006/29]
Former International [2004/35]G01G23/01
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/35]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur digitalen Sicherung von Messwerten[2004/35]
English:Method and device for digital protection of measured values[2004/35]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la protection digitale de valeurs mesurées[2004/35]
Examination procedure07.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/03]
06.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.11.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
21.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
20.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200704   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.2007
28.02.201007   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0051284  (INTERFACE LOGIC SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,4,6-8 * abstract * * page 1, line 3 - page 5, line 18 *;
 [X]US2001002485  (BISBEE STEPHEN F [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0028] *;
 [A]EP1217783  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 2,5 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 1,11 *;
 [A]EP0949563  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 3,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * figure 3 *;
 [A]  - SCHMEH, KLAUS, "Kryptographie und Public-Key-Infrastrukturen im Internet", DPUNKT.VERLAG, Heidelberg, (2001), pages 150 - 151, XP002383982 [A] 3,9 * page 150 - page 151 *
by applicantEP0911618
 DE4441231
 WO0051284