EP1457583 - Mechanical enhancement of dense and porous organosilicate materials by UV exposure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Versum Materials US, LLC 8555 River Parkway Tempe, AZ 85284 / US | [2017/38] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lukas, Aaron Scott 107 Finch Run Lansdale PA 19446 / US | 02 /
O'Neill, Mark Leonard 830 N. 30th Street Allentown PA 18104 / US | 03 /
Vincent, Jean Louise 3943 Suncrest Lane Bethlehem PA 18020 / US | 04 /
Vrtis, Raymond Nicholas 1510 Randi Lane Orefield PA 18069 / US | 05 /
Bitner, Mark Daniel 17 East High Street Nazareth PA 18064 / US | 06 /
Karwacki, Eugene Joseph, Jr. 5620 Snowdrift Lane Orefield PA 18069 / US | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/38] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04004877.9 | 02.03.2004 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | US20030624357 | 21.07.2003 Original published format: US 624357 | US20030379466 | 04.03.2003 Original published format: US 379466 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1457583 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1457583 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1457583 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1457583 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/316, C23C16/40, C23C16/56, H01L21/3105 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
H01L21/02126 (EP);
E21B4/14 (KR);
C23C16/401 (EP);
C23C16/56 (EP);
H01L21/02203 (EP);
H01L21/02211 (EP);
H01L21/02216 (EP);
H01L21/02274 (EP);
H01L21/02348 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/38] | C23C16/56, C23C16/40, H01L21/31 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/22] |
Former [2010/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mechanische Verstärkung von dichten und porösen Organosilikatmaterialien durch UV-Bestrahlung | [2004/38] | English: | Mechanical enhancement of dense and porous organosilicate materials by UV exposure | [2004/38] | French: | Amelioration de la stabilite mechanique de materiaux organosilicate denses ou poreux par rayonnement UV | [2004/38] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 30.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2010 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 03.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2010 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17167460.9 / EP3231892 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2004 | AT | 31.05.2017 | CY | 31.05.2017 | CZ | 31.05.2017 | DK | 31.05.2017 | EE | 31.05.2017 | ES | 31.05.2017 | FI | 31.05.2017 | MC | 31.05.2017 | PL | 31.05.2017 | PT | 31.05.2017 | RO | 31.05.2017 | SE | 31.05.2017 | SI | 31.05.2017 | SK | 31.05.2017 | TR | 31.05.2017 | BG | 31.08.2017 | GR | 01.09.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 02.03.2004 | |
AT | 31.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
PT | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
TR | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
MC | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
PL | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
CZ | 31.05.2017 | ||
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
RO | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
SK | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
DK | 31.05.2017 | ||
EE | 31.05.2017 | ||
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
SE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 31.08.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 31.05.2017 | |
ES | 31.05.2017 | ||
FI | 31.05.2017 | ||
GR | 01.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0537364 (SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESS LAB CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,17,18 * column 12, line 20 - column 13, line 40 *; | [X]EP0575650 (SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESS LAB CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-14,17,18 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 11 * * column 4, line 22 - column 7, line 31 * * column 17, line 35 - column 19, line 40 *; | [X]EP1122333 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-14,17,18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] - [0009] - [0012] *; | [X]US2002065331 (ZAMPINI ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 30-37 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] - [0076] - [0078] - [0081] , [0082] *; | [XA]EP1225194 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 15,16,19-21,24,25 * paragraphs [0030] - [0041] - [0049] - [0080]; tables 1-3 * [A] 1-14,17,18,22,23,26-37; | [XA]US2002119676 (AOI NOBUO [JP]) [X] 15,16,19-21,26-29 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0013] , [0018] , [0020] , [0022] - [0025] - [0047] , [0048] , [0051] - [0060] - [0075] , [0076] * [A] 1-14,17,18,22-25,32-37; | [PXD]US2003054115 (ALBANO RALPH [US], et al) [PXD] 1-14,17,18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0021] - [0028] - [0063] - [0087] *; | [PXL]EP1354980 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [PXL] 15,16,19,21-25 * L: Priority; paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0015] - [0039] - [0046] - [0064] - [0066] , [0076] , [0077] , [0083] - [0088] - [0091] - [0098] *; | [PXL]US2003198742 (VRTIS RAYMOND NICHOLAS [US], et al) [PXL] 30,31 * L: Priority; paragraphs [0129] - [0133] - [0137] - [0145] *; | [E]EP1420439 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [E] 15,16,19,21-23,26 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0015] - [0024] , [0025] , [0030] , [0031] , [0054] , [0059] , [0075] , [0100]; examples 1-6; claims 26-29 *; | [E]US2004096672 (LUKAS AARON SCOTT [US], et al) [E] 15,16,19,21-23,26* paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0015] - [0024] , [0025] , [0030] , [0031] , [0054] , [0059] , [0075] , [0100]; examples 1-6 *; | [E]EP1464726 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [E] 1-14,17,18 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013] - [0090] - [0095] *; | [A] - "A single precursor photolitic chemical vapor deposition of silica film using a dielectric barier discharge xenon excimer lamp", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19960902), vol. 69, no. 10, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1399 - 1401, XP012016011 [A] 1-14,17,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.117594 | [XA] - GRILL A ET AL, "Ultralow-k dielectrics prepared by plasma-enhanced chemical vapor deposition", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20010806), vol. 79, no. 6, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 803 - 805, XP012029992 [X] 15,16,19,30,31 * the whole document * [A] 1-14,17,18,20-37 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1392976 | [A] - WU Z-C ET AL, "PHYSICAL AND ELECTRICAL CHARACTERISTICS OF METHYLSILANE- AND TRIMETHYLSILANE-DOPED LOW DIELECTRIC CONSTANT CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITED OXIDES", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, US, (20010601), vol. 148, no. 6, ISSN 0013-4651, pages F127 - F132, XP001058314 [A] 15,16,19-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1369373 | Examination | WO0223629 | WO03015129 | - ETEMADI R ET AL, "Optical and compositional study of silicon oxide thin films deposited in a dual-mode (microwave/radiofrequency) plasma-enhanced chemical vapor deposition reactor", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, US, (19980515), vol. 83, no. 10, doi:10.1063/1.367343, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 5224 - 5232, XP012043825 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.367343 | - HOZUMI A ET AL, "PHOTOCALCINATION OF MESOPOROUS SILICA FILMS USING VACUUM ULTRAVIOLET LIGHT", ADVANCED MATERIALS, WILEY - V C H VERLAG GMBH & CO. KGAA, DE, (20000705), vol. 12, no. 13, doi:10.1002/1521-4095(200006)12:13<985::AID-ADMA985>3.0.CO;2-#, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 985 - 987, XP000937090 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4095(200006)12:13<985::AID-ADMA985>3.0.CO;2-# | - C. Waldfried ET AL, "Single wafer RapidCuring/spl trade/ of porous low-k materials", Proceedings of the IEEE 2002 International Interconnect Technology Conference, 2002, (20020101), doi:10.1109/IITC.2002.1014941, ISBN 978-0-7803-7216-0, pages 226 - 228, XP055246289 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IITC.2002.1014941 | by applicant | JPS59124729 | US4603168 | WO9700535 | US5609925 | US5935646 | US5970384 | US6017806 | US6042994 | US6168980 | WO0129052 | US6231989 | EP1122333 | WO0161737 | US6284050 | JP2001257207 | US2001038919 | US2001055891 | WO0222710 | US6426236 | US2002102413 | US2002106500 | WO02065534 | US2002132496 | US2002142585 | US6472076 | US6475930 | US6495479 | US2003003288 | US2003032300 | US2003054115 | WO03025993 | WO03025994 | US2003087042 | US2003151031 | US2003162034 | US2003198742 | US2003224622 | US2003232137 | US2004096593 | US2004096672 | WO2004083495 | EP1482550 | US2005048795 | WO2005019303 | US7041748 | - E. G. PARADA ET AL., "Improvement of Silicon Oxide Film Properties by Ultraviolet Excimer Lamp Annealing", APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 86, doi:doi:10.1016/0169-4332(94)00433-1, pages 294 - 298, XP005278386 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-4332(94)00433-1 | - A. GUO ET AL., "Highly Active Visible-Light Photocatalysts for Curing a Ceramic Precursor1", CHEM MATER., (1998), vol. 10, pages 531 - 536 | - T. CLARK. JR. ET AL., "A New Application of UV-Ozone Treatment in the Preparation of Substrate-Supported, Mesoporous Thin Films", CHEM. MATER., (2000), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1021/cm000456f, pages 3879 - 3884, XP055077221 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm000456f | - M. BRINKMANN ET AL., "Room-Temperature Synthesis of a-Si02 Thin Films by UV-Assisted Ozonolysis of a Polymer Precursor", CHEM. MATER., (2001), vol. 13, pages 967 - 972 | - A. HOZUMI ET AL., "Low-Temperature Elimination of Organic Components from Mesostructured Organic-Inorganic Composite Films Using Vacuum Ultraviolet Light", CHEM. MATER., (2000), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1021/cm000546k, pages 3842 - 3847, XP008060695 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm000546k | - M. OUYANG ET AL., "Conversion of Some Siloxane Polymers to Silicon Oxide by UV/Ozone Photochemical Processes", CHEM. MATER., (2000), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1021/cm990770d, pages 1591 - 1596, XP002267213 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm990770d | - Q. HAN ET AL., "Ultra Low-k Porous Silicon Dioxide Films from a Plasma Process", IEEE, (2001), pages 171 - 173 | - C. WALDFRIED ET AL., "Single Wafer RapidCuring of Porous Low-k Materials", IEEE, (2002), pages 226 - 228 |