Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1577741

EP1577741 - Dynamic assigning of functions to an input unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB
221 88 Lund / SE
[2005/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Thoresson, Johan
Dr Westrings gata 21B
413 24 Göteborg / SE
 [2005/38]
Representative(s)Dahnér, Christer , et al
Valea AB
Box 7086
103 87 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Dahnér, Christer , et al
Valea AB Box 7086
103 87 Stockholm / SE
Former [2005/38]Dahnér, Christer , et al
Valea AB Box 7086
103 87 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date04005776.211.03.2004
[2005/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1577741
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1577741
Date:17.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP31.01.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/023, G06F3/033
[2005/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/38]
TitleGerman:Dynamische Zuweisung von Funktionen zu einer Eingabeeinheit[2005/38]
English:Dynamic assigning of functions to an input unit[2005/38]
French:Affectation dynamique de fonctions à une unité d'entrée[2005/38]
Examination procedure17.03.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/20]
28.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2007Fee for grant paid
03.09.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.10.2007
BE17.10.2007
CH17.10.2007
CY17.10.2007
CZ17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
EE17.10.2007
FI17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
TR17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
GR18.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
IE11.03.2008
LU11.03.2008
PT17.03.2008
IT31.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
HU18.04.2008
[2011/13]
Former [2010/37]AT17.10.2007
BE17.10.2007
CH17.10.2007
CY17.10.2007
CZ17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
EE17.10.2007
FI17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
TR17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
GR18.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
IE11.03.2008
LU11.03.2008
PT17.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
HU18.04.2008
Former [2010/34]AT17.10.2007
BE17.10.2007
CH17.10.2007
CY17.10.2007
CZ17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
EE17.10.2007
FI17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
GR18.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
IE11.03.2008
LU11.03.2008
PT17.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
HU18.04.2008
Former [2010/32]AT17.10.2007
BE17.10.2007
CH17.10.2007
CY17.10.2007
CZ17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
EE17.10.2007
FI17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
GR18.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
IE11.03.2008
LU11.03.2008
PT17.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2009/35]AT17.10.2007
BE17.10.2007
CH17.10.2007
CY17.10.2007
CZ17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
EE17.10.2007
FI17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
GR18.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
IE11.03.2008
PT17.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2009/11]AT17.10.2007
BE17.10.2007
CH17.10.2007
CZ17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
EE17.10.2007
FI17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
GR18.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
IE11.03.2008
PT17.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2009/08]AT17.10.2007
BE17.10.2007
CH17.10.2007
CZ17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
IE11.03.2008
PT17.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2008/46]AT17.10.2007
BE17.10.2007
CH17.10.2007
CZ17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
PT17.03.2008
MC31.03.2008
Former [2008/39]AT17.10.2007
BE17.10.2007
CH17.10.2007
CZ17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
RO17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
SK17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2008/35]AT17.10.2007
CH17.10.2007
CZ17.10.2007
DK17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT17.10.2007
CH17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2008/26]CH17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
SI17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
PT17.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH17.10.2007
LI17.10.2007
NL17.10.2007
PL17.10.2007
BG17.01.2008
SE17.01.2008
ES28.01.2008
PT17.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1033644  (PHONE COM INC [US]) [X] 1,8,12,13,3,2,9 * paragraphs [0014] - [0024] - [0028] - [0048] - [0052]; figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0021] , [0023] , [0024] , [0038] - [0044] - [0046] * * paragraphs [0029] , [0040] , [0043] * * paragraphs [0046] , [0051] , [0052] * * paragraphs [0024] , [0048] * * paragraphs [0014] , [0021] - [0024] - [0029] , [0039] * * paragraphs [0024] , [0029] , [0039] , [0046] , [0052] * [Y] 7 [XY] 6,10,11,5,4;
 [XY]EP1115082  (MONARCH MARKING SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,8,10-13,3,2,9 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0013] - [0019] * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0014] , [0015] , [0019] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0013] - [0019] * [Y] 4-7,10,11;
 [Y]EP0946028  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0010] , [0026] - [0028] - [0034] , [0040] - [0046] *