blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1469242

EP1469242 - Valve handles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Georg Fischer Rohrleitungssysteme AG
Ebnatstrasse 111
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
[2006/08]
Former [2004/43]For all designated states
Georg Fischer Rohrleitungssysteme AG
Ebnatstrasse 111
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Miklo, Jürgen
Frohsinnweg 5
8240 Thayngen / CH
02 / Schäpper, Walter
Sindenweg 5
9470 Buchs / CH
 [2004/43]
Representative(s)Weiss, Wolfgang
Georg Fischer AG Patentabteilung Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
[2009/49]
Former [2004/43]Weiss, Wolfgang, Dr.
c/o Georg Fischer AG, Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
Application number, filing date04006312.517.03.2004
[2004/43]
Priority number, dateDE200311780816.04.2003         Original published format: DE 10317808
[2004/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1469242
Date:20.10.2004
Language:DE
[2004/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1469242
Date:22.02.2006
Language:DE
[2006/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.2004
ClassificationIPC:F16K31/60, F16K35/02
[2004/43]
CPC:
F16K35/025 (EP,US); F16K31/60 (EP,US); Y10T137/7062 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7069 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/43]
TitleGerman:Handgriffe für Ventile[2004/43]
English:Valve handles[2004/43]
French:Poignées pour soupapes[2004/43]
Examination procedure09.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/01]
26.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2005Fee for grant paid
25.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.02.2006
CZ22.02.2006
EE22.02.2006
FI22.02.2006
GB22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
PL22.02.2006
RO22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
SK22.02.2006
TR22.02.2006
LU17.03.2006
BE31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG22.05.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
GR23.05.2006
ES02.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
HU23.08.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]CZ22.02.2006
EE22.02.2006
FI22.02.2006
GB22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
PL22.02.2006
RO22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
SK22.02.2006
TR22.02.2006
LU17.03.2006
BE31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG22.05.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
GR23.05.2006
ES02.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
HU23.08.2006
Former [2008/32]CZ22.02.2006
EE22.02.2006
FI22.02.2006
GB22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
PL22.02.2006
RO22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
SK22.02.2006
BE31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG22.05.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
GR23.05.2006
ES02.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
HU23.08.2006
Former [2008/28]CZ22.02.2006
EE22.02.2006
FI22.02.2006
GB22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
PL22.02.2006
RO22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
SK22.02.2006
BE31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG22.05.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
GR23.05.2006
ES02.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2008/21]CZ22.02.2006
FI22.02.2006
GB22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
PL22.02.2006
RO22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
SK22.02.2006
BE31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG22.05.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
GR23.05.2006
ES02.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2007/45]FI22.02.2006
GB22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
PL22.02.2006
RO22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
SK22.02.2006
BE31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG22.05.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
ES02.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2007/42]FI22.02.2006
GB22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
IT22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
PL22.02.2006
RO22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
SK22.02.2006
BE31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG22.05.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
ES02.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2007/15]FI22.02.2006
GB22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
PL22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
SK22.02.2006
BE31.03.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG22.05.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
ES02.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2007/03]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
SK22.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG22.05.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
ES02.06.2006
Former [2007/01]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG22.05.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
ES02.06.2006
Former [2006/49]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
BG22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
ES02.06.2006
Former [2006/45]FI22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
SE22.05.2006
ES02.06.2006
Former [2006/40]FI22.02.2006
SI22.02.2006
ES02.06.2006
Former [2006/36]FI22.02.2006
ES02.06.2006
Former [2006/34]ES02.06.2006
Documents cited:Search[YA]US1958165  (LE COMPTE WILLIAM G) [Y] 6,7 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 47 * * figure - * [A] 1-4;
 [A]US5213308  (JEROMSON JEFFREY T [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 16 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [DA]DE4336008  (FIP FORMATURA INIENZIONE POLI [IT]) [DA] 1-7 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 32 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [DA]EP0773395  (FABRICATION IND SAFI SA D [FR]) [DA] 1-7 * column 3, line 23 - column 7, line 22 * * figure - *;
 [XY]FR2756034  (FABRICATION IND SA D [FR]) [X] 1-4 * page 4, line 2 - page 10, line 3 * * figures 1-8 * [Y] 6,7;
 [A]WO0118439  (AUSTRALIAN DYNAMIC PRODUCTS PT [AU], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 6 * * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 29 * * page 14, line 7 - page 15, line 5 ** figures 1,2,17-32,66-69 *
by applicantDE4336008
 EP0773395
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.