Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1593386

EP1593386 - Use of galectin-2 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2007
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Charité - Universitätsmedizin Berlin
Schumannstrasse 20/21
10117 Berlin / DE
[2005/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Dignass, Axel
Schönholzer Weg 20
13158 Berlin / DE
02 / Rosewicz, Stefan
Ludolfingerweg 24
13465 Berlin / DE
03 / Sturm, Andreas
Huntestrasse 3a
14167 Berlin / DE
 [2005/45]
Representative(s)Engelhard, Markus
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Engelhard, Markus
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date04007345.426.03.2004
[2005/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1593386
Date:09.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1593386
Date:21.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/17, A61P37/06
[2005/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/45]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Galectin-2[2005/45]
English:Use of galectin-2[2005/45]
French:Utilisation de galectin-2[2005/45]
Examination procedure13.10.2004Examination requested  [2005/45]
02.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2006Fee for grant paid
27.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
CZ21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
EE21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
RO21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SK21.02.2007
TR21.02.2007
IE26.03.2007
LU26.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
HU22.08.2007
[2013/51]
Former [2009/44]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
CZ21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
EE21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
RO21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SK21.02.2007
TR21.02.2007
IE26.03.2007
LU26.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
HU22.08.2007
Former [2009/40]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
CZ21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
EE21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
RO21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SK21.02.2007
IE26.03.2007
LU26.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2009/35]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CY21.02.2007
CZ21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
EE21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
RO21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SK21.02.2007
IE26.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2009/11]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CZ21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
EE21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
RO21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SK21.02.2007
IE26.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2008/22]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CZ21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
RO21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SK21.02.2007
IE26.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
GR22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2008/11]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CZ21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
RO21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SK21.02.2007
IE26.03.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2008/09]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CZ21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
RO21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SK21.02.2007
MC31.03.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2008/04]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CZ21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
RO21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SK21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2008/02]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
CZ21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SK21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2007/51]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SK21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2007/49]AT21.02.2007
BE21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
PT23.07.2007
Former [2007/47]AT21.02.2007
DK21.02.2007
FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
SI21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
Former [2007/42]FI21.02.2007
NL21.02.2007
PL21.02.2007
SE21.05.2007
BG22.05.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004023855  (JOHN CONSTANCE M [US], et al) [X] 34-36 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0014]; claims 2,4,7,9,11; table 4 *;
 [X]WO02089831  ;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 35, Database accession no. 2003-367092, XP002292305 & WO02089831 A1 20021114 (PROTEGENE KK) [X] 34-36 * abstract *
 [A]  - "GALECTINS: A FAMILY OF ANIMAL SS-GALACTOSIDE-BINDING LECTINS", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, (19940225), vol. 76, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 597 - 598, XP002922187 [A] 1-36 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(94)90498-7
 [A]  - LIU FU-TONG, "Galectins: A new family of regulators of inflammation", CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY (ORLANDO), (200011), vol. 97, no. 2, ISSN 1521-6616, pages 79 - 88, XP001182659 [A] 1-36 * Introduction *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/clim.2000.4912