Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1583292

EP1583292 - Delayed base station relocation in distributed radio access networks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.02.2013
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.03.2013  [2013/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2005/40]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Petrovic, Dragan
Am Kaiserschlag 15
64295 Darmstadt / DE
02 / Seidel, Eiko
Moosbergstrasse 97 a-b
64285 Darmstadt / DE
03 / Löhr, Joachim
Soderstr.90
64287 Darmstadt / DE
 [2005/40]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/40]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date04007701.830.03.2004
[2005/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1583292
Date:05.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56, H04Q7/30
[2005/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/40]
TitleGerman:Verzögerte Relocation der Basistationen in einem verteilten Funkzugriffsnetzwerk[2005/40]
English:Delayed base station relocation in distributed radio access networks[2005/40]
French:Relocalisation de stations de base retardée dans un réseau d'accès radio distribué[2005/40]
Examination procedure09.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/18]
05.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/13]
09.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/13]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.06.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
30.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201209   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1047279  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC) [X] 1-3,7-13,15,21,22,24-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0016] - [0021] * [Y] 4-6,14,17,23,27-29;
 [XA]DE10120772  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-3,7-13,15,21-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0033]; figures 1,2 * [A] 4-6,14,16,17,27-29;
 [XA]US2002119780  (ROUX PIERRE ET AL) [X] 1-3,7-13,15,21-26 * paragraphs [0006] , [0052] , [0058] - [0065]; figure 3 * [A] 4-6,14,16,17,27-29
 [XY]  - 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), "TR 25.897 V0.3.1 ;Technical specification Group Radio Access Network; Feasibility Study on the Evolution of UTRAN architecture (Release 6)", TECHNICAL REPORT, (200308), pages 1 - 31, URL: www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/25_series/25.897, XP002290964 [X] 1-3,7-13,15,16,21,22,24-26 * pages 10-13 * [Y] 4-6,14,17,23,27-29