blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1469663

EP1469663 - Method and apparatus for dynamic audio and web conference scheduling, bridging, synchronization, and management [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.10.2007  [2007/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genesys Telecommunications Laboratories, Inc.
2001 Junipero Serra Boulevard
Daly City, CA 94014 / US
[2004/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Zhakov, Vyacheslav I.
1349 Ridgewood Dr.
Milbrae CA 94030 / US
02 / Sayko, Vyacheslav V.
131 Piccadilly Place Apartment G
San Bruno, CA 94066 / US
03 / Epiktetov, Mikhail Gennadyevich
320 Peninsula Ave. Apartment 318
San Mateo, CA 94401 / US
04 / Seignol, Thierry
49 Windward Drive
Corte Madera CA 94925 / US
05 / Frazer, Mathew
79 Collins Street
San Francisco, CA 94118 / US
 [2006/38]
Former [2004/43]01 / Zhakov, Vyacheslav I.
5322 D'Avilla Way Apartment D
El Sobrante, CA 94803 / US
02 / Sayko, Vyacheslav V.
131 Piccadilly Place Apartment G
San Bruno, CA 94066 / US
03 / Epiktetov, Mikhail Gennadyevich
320 Peninsula Ave. Apartment 318
San Mateo, CA 94401 / US
04 / Seignol, Thierry
49 Windward Drive
Corte Madera CA 94925 / US
05 / Frazer, Mathew
79 Collins Street
San Francisco, CA 94118 / US
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/43]Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker
Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date04007911.301.04.2004
[2004/43]
Priority number, dateUS2003040634702.04.2003         Original published format: US 406347
[2004/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1469663
Date:20.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.2004
ClassificationIPC:H04M3/56, H04M7/00, H04L12/18
[2004/43]
CPC:
H04L12/1818 (EP,US); H04M3/563 (EP,US); H04M3/565 (EP,US);
H04M3/567 (EP,US); H04L12/1836 (EP,US); H04M2203/5063 (EP,US);
H04M3/382 (EP,US); H04M3/42374 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/28]
Former [2004/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Plannung, Verbindung, Synchronisierung und Verwaltung Audio und Internet-basierter Konferenzen[2004/43]
English:Method and apparatus for dynamic audio and web conference scheduling, bridging, synchronization, and management[2004/43]
French:Système et procédé pour la planification, connexion, synchronisation et gestion dynamiques de conférences audio et par internet[2004/43]
Examination procedure23.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/08]
21.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2005Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.09.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
20.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/40]
18.05.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.06.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005BG   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005CZ   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005EE   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005HU   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005PL   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005RO   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005SI   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005SK   M01   Not yet paid
08.06.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4558180  (SCORDO DOMINICK [US]) [X] 51-54 * abstract * * column 1, lines 28-32,55-62 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 25 * * column 15, line 36 - column 16, line 6 * * column 30, line 20 - column 32, line 2 * * column 40, line 66 - column 42, line 4 * * figures 1,6,10,22 *;
 [XA]EP0883306  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-35,37-40 * abstract * * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 44 * * column 5, line 25 - column 12, line 15; figures 3a,4-6 * [A] 36,41-54;
 [XA]EP1006706  (SIEMENS INF & COMM NETWORKS [US]) [X] 41-50 * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 37 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 18 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 27; figures 2,6,7 * [A] 1-40,51-54;
 [XA]WO0152513  (RIGHT4ME COM INC [US]) [X] 1-41,44,45,47-50 * abstract * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 18 * * page 7, lines 16-28 * * page 9, line 1 - page 15, line 31; figures 1-3,4a-4c * * page 17, line 14 - page 19, line 2; figures 5a,6-8,9a * [A] 42,43,46,51-54;
 [XA]US2001023430  (SRINIVASAN THIRU [US]) [X] 1-35,37,38 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 5-7 * * page 2, paragraphs 17,18,21 * * page 3, paragraphs 11-15 * * figures 1,2,4,5 * [A] 36,39-54;
 [A]US2002078150  (THOMPSON CHRISTOPHER [CA], et al) [A] 1-54 * page 1, paragraphs 9,10 * * page 2, paragraphs 13-16,21,23 * * page 3, paragraph 25 * * page 4, paragraph 66 - page 6, paragraph 70 * * page 6, paragraph 74 * * page 7, paragraph 77; figure 5 * * page 8, paragraph 86 * * page 9, paragraph 87 * * page 17, paragraphs 130-133 * * page 18, paragraph 134 * * page 20, line 2 - page 21, line 3 * * page 25, paragraphs 174,175 * * page 27, paragraph 183 *;
 [A]US2002136167  (STEELE RICK [US], et al) [A] 1-54 * page 1, paragraphs 5-7 * * page 2, paragraphs 16,19,21,25,27-29 * * page 3, paragraphs 33,37,38 ** page 4, paragraphs 41,42,52; figure 1 *;
 [A]  - "CONFERENCING METAPHOR", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19930201), vol. 36, no. 2, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 63 - 66, XP000354262 [A] 1-54 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.