Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1467434

EP1467434 - Antenna and speaker configuration for a mobile radio device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.04.2011  [2011/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICROSOFT CORPORATION
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2004/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Voth, David William
13334 186th Avenue NE Woodinville
Washington 98072 / US
02 / Taylor, Dina Christine
8632 9th Avenue SW Seattle
Washington 98106 / US
 [2004/42]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/42]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date04008331.306.04.2004
[2004/42]
Priority number, dateUS2003041165711.04.2003         Original published format: US 411657
[2004/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1467434
Date:13.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/24, H01Q1/44
[2004/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/42]
TitleGerman:Anordnung aus Antenne und Lautsprecher für ein Mobilfunkgerät[2004/42]
English:Antenna and speaker configuration for a mobile radio device[2004/42]
French:Configuration d'antenne et haut-parleur pour un dispositif radio mobile[2004/42]
Examination procedure16.03.2005Examination requested  [2005/19]
03.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/17]
07.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201007   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003068987  (DUFOSSE STEPHANE [FR], et al) [X] 1-25 * paragraphs [0008] , [0012] , [0031] , [0035] - [0044]; figures 4,5 *;
 [XY]US2002187758  (YLITALO JUHA [FI], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,15-20,22-25 * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0034] - [0053]; figures 2,4,7-11 * [Y] 6,14,21;
 [Y]EP1091539  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [Y] 6,14,21 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0011] - [0024]; figures 2,4,5 *;
 [Y]US6324284  (HAWKER LARRY E [CA], et al) [Y] 6,14,21 * column 1, line 51 - column 4, line 65; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US6201501  (ARKKO AIMO [FI], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 6; figures 1,2 *