Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1453292

EP1453292 - Image data improvement for wirelessly transmitted digital image data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.12.2005  [2005/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swiss Imaging Technologies AG
Riedthofstrasse 214
8105 Regensdorf / DE
[2004/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Näf, Markus
Cäcilienstrasse 5
8032 Zürich / CH
02 / Nussbaumer, Marc
Neuhausstrasse 6
8044 Zürich / CH
 [2004/36]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/36]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date04010083.630.11.2001
[2004/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1453292
Date:01.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/00
[2004/36]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2005/20]
Former [2004/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bilddatenverbesserung für drahtlos übertragene digitale Bilddaten[2004/36]
English:Image data improvement for wirelessly transmitted digital image data[2004/36]
French:Amélioration de données d'image pour des données d'image transmises sans fil[2004/36]
Examination procedure28.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/36]
22.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/49]
07.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/49]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01128348.8  / EP1317124
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2001022621  (SQUIBBS ROBERT FRANCIS [GB]) [X] 1-6,9,10 * paragraphs [0035] , [0036] , [0104]; figure 11 * [Y] 7,8;
 [Y]WO0175667  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 7,8 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9917529  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,9 * page 5, line 31 - page 12, line L; figure - *;
 [X]JPH10143520  ;
 [Y]WO0049797  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NA [US]) [Y] 1-6,9 * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 15 * * page 3, line 17 - line 26 * * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 18; figure 2 *;
 [Y]WO0000895  (FOTONATION INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,9 * page 5, line 12 - page 8, line 2; figure 1 * * page 12, line 5 - page 13, line 10; figure 8 *;
 [Y]WO0031966  (NI4U CORP [US]) [Y] 5 * page 5 - page 14; figure - *;
 [A]WO0125094  (LAVENDER SALLY ANN [ZA], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2001019420  (SANBONGI MASAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2001022618  (WARD JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0045] *;
 [A]US2001009456  (TANAKA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0055]; figure - *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, [X] 1 * abstract *