Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1464351

EP1464351 - Low-profile automatic injection device with self-emptying reservoir [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2007
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/01]For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes
New Jersey 07417-1880 / US
Former [2004/41]For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sage, Burton H.
3430 Bernardino Lane
Vista California 92084 / US
02 / Connelly, Robert I.
2901 Kenwick Court
Raleigh, Northern Carolina 27613 / US
 [2004/52]
Former [2004/50]01 / Sage, Burton H.
3430 Bernardino Lane
Vista California 92084 / US
02 / Connelly, Robert I.
6 Indian Head Court
Durham North Carolina 27703 / US
Former [2004/41]01 / Sage, Burton H.
7001 Jeffrey Drive
Raleigh North Carolina 27603 / US
02 / Connelly, Robert I.
6 Indian Head Court
Durham North Carolina 27703 / US
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/41]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date04011624.601.02.1999
[2004/41]
Priority number, dateUS1998002729120.02.1998         Original published format: US 27291
[2004/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1464351
Date:06.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1464351
Date:12.01.2005
[2005/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1464351
Date:03.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/145, A61M5/28, A61M5/142
[2005/02]
Former International [2004/41]A61M5/142
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/41]
TitleGerman:Selbsttätige Injektionsvorrichtung mit niederem Profil und mit einem selbstentleerenden Behälter[2004/41]
English:Low-profile automatic injection device with self-emptying reservoir[2004/41]
French:Dispositif d'injection automatique à profil plat avec réservoir à auto-vidage[2004/41]
Examination procedure15.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/41]
04.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2006Fee for grant paid
27.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99102038.9  / EP0937475
Opposition(s)05.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
15.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO8704631  (UNIV MINNESOTA [US]) [Y] 1-3 * page 10, line 1 - page 16, line 11; figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]WO9741917  (CERAMATEC INC [US]) [Y] 1-3 * page 6, line 1 - page 10, line 21; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]WO9710012  (ELAN MED TECH [IE], et al) [A] 1 * page 14, line 6 - page 16, line 13; figures 1-4 *;
 [DA]US5656032  (KRIESEL MARSHALL S [US], et al) [DA] 1 * column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 67; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]DE4039191  (B. BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG) [A] 1,2 * abstract *