blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1489637

EP1489637 - A portable communication apparatus, a rotary input device having an end-user-exchangeable element, and an end-user-exchangeable element for a rotary input device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/52]A portable communication apparatus, a rotary input device having an and-user-exchangeable element, and an end-user-exchangeable element for a rotary input device
[2005/01]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.05.2011
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.06.2011  [2011/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
00045 Espoo / FI
[2004/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Balle, Henrik
Praestelaengen 15, 3.t.v.
2400 Copenhagen / DK
02 / Bonnelykke, Jakob
Valmuevej 10
3650 Oalstykke / DK
03 / Lodahl, Jesper, East Lake Villas, Unit B801
35 Dongzhimenwai Main Street
100027 Beijing / CH
04 / Christjansen, Rasmus
Hedetoften 47, 1th
2640 Hedehusene / DK
05 / Saxe Knudsen, Christian
Indiakaj 11, 5. mf
2100 Copenhagen / DK
 [2004/52]
Representative(s)Lind, Urban Arvid Oskar, et al
Awapatent AB
Södra Hamngatan 37-41
404 28 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2009/18]Lind, Urban Arvid Oskar, et al
AWAPATENT AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41
44 28 Göteborg / SE
Former [2008/09]Roman Ekstedt, Måns, et al
Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41
404 28 Göteborg / SE
Former [2004/52]Andersson, Björn, et al
Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date04012405.926.05.2004
[2004/52]
Priority number, dateUS2003044937329.05.2003         Original published format: US 449373
[2004/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1489637
Date:22.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1489637
Date:12.12.2007
[2007/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2007
ClassificationIPC:H01H9/54
[2004/52]
CPC:
G06F3/0362 (EP,US); H04B1/38 (KR); H04M1/72469 (EP,US);
H01H11/0018 (EP,US); H01H25/065 (EP,US); H04M1/23 (EP,KR,US);
H01H2221/066 (EP,US); H04M1/233 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/52]
TitleGerman:Tragbares Kommunikationsgerät, drehbares Eingabegerät mit austauschbarem Endbenutzerelement und austauschbares Endbenutzerelement für ein drehbares Eingabegerät.[2005/01]
English:A portable communication apparatus, a rotary input device having an end-user-exchangeable element, and an end-user-exchangeable element for a rotary input device[2005/01]
French:Appareil de communication portable, dispositif d'entrée rotatif avec un élément interchangeable pour l'utilisateur final, et un élément interchangeable pour l'utilisateur final pour un dispositif d'entrée rotatif.[2005/01]
Former [2004/52]Tragbares Kommunikationsgerät, drehbares Eingabegerät mit austauschbaren Endbenutzerelement und austauschbares Endbenutzerelement fürein drehbares Eingabegerät
Former [2004/52]A portable communication apparatus, a rotary input device having an and-user-exchangeable element, and an end-user-exchangeable element for a rotary input device
Former [2004/52]Appareil de communication portable, dispositif d'entrée rotatif avec un élément interchangeable pour l'utilisateur final, et un élément interchangeable pour un dispositif d'entrée rotatif.
Examination procedure05.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/29]
02.12.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/26]
25.01.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201007   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0585730  (GILLIGAN FEDERICO GUSTAVO [AR], et al) [Y] 1-4,16-19,31 * page 4, paragraph L; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0853268  (HOELZER & WULF KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1,18,31 * abstract *;
 [AD]EP1028574  (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]);
 [X]WO0237806  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [X] 1-4,16-19,31 * the whole document *;
 [DY]WO0239712  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [DY] 1-4,16-19,31 * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 1; figure 2; claims 1,9 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.