blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1533987

EP1533987 - Multifunction apparatus and distribution server [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.04.2014
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.05.2014  [2014/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2005/21]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kitajima, Ikuo
1-27-11, Miharadai Nerima-ku
Tokyo 177-0031 / JP
02 / Ozaki, Minoru
11-3, Sakae-machi
Kawanishi-shi Hyogo 666-0033 / JP
03 / Osanai, Akira
33-1-301, Higashikubo-cho Nishi-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-0062 / JP
04 / Matsuzawa, Yukari
1-17-2-202, Hara-machi Meguro-ku
Tokyo 152-0011 / JP
05 / Sakamoto, Masakiyo
2-11-5-2G, Yaguchi Ota-ku
Tokyo 146-0093 / JP
 [2005/21]
Representative(s)Meldrum, David James, et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/14]Meldrum, David James, et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2007/20]Dempster, Robert Charles, et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2005/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date04012492.726.05.2004
[2005/21]
Priority number, dateJP2003038920319.11.2003         Original published format: JP 2003389203
[2005/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1533987
Date:25.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1533987
Date:28.09.2005
[2005/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.08.2005
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/00
[2005/21]
CPC:
H04N1/00413 (EP,US); H04N1/00209 (EP,US); H04N1/00244 (EP,US);
H04N1/00384 (EP,US); H04N1/00395 (EP,US); H04N1/00408 (EP,US);
H04N1/00435 (EP,US); H04N1/00474 (EP,US); H04N1/32021 (EP,US);
H04N1/32069 (EP,US); H04N1/32523 (EP,US); H04N1/32545 (EP,US);
H04N1/32561 (EP,US); H04N1/32771 (EP,US); H04N1/32789 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0094 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/23]
Former [2005/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Multifunktionsvorrichtung und Verteilungsserver[2005/21]
English:Multifunction apparatus and distribution server[2005/21]
French:Dispositif à usage multiple et serveur de distribution[2005/21]
Examination procedure27.10.2005Examination requested  [2005/52]
23.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/20]
09.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/20]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.01.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
19.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
19.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
14.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201310   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2001051823  ;
 [A]JPH06236335  ;
 [A]JPH0997156  ;
 [A]JP2002140353
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, & JP2001051823 A 20010223 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941125), vol. 018, no. 621, Database accession no. (P - 1832), & JP06236335 A 19940823 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09097156 A 19970408 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020904), vol. 2002, no. 09, & JP2002140353 A 20020517 (JUST SYST CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract *
ExaminationUS2001019338
 US2003011633
by applicantJP2001051823
 US2001019338
 US2003011633
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.