blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1482304 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1482304



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 461
04.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
04.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.04.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 2
12.04.2017 Refund of fees Appeal 1
10.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.04.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 15
06.04.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
03.11.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.11.2016 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
29.08.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.06.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.06.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
06.06.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 4
31.05.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.05.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
23.05.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 4
15.04.2016 General authorisation Appeal 2
15.04.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.02.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.02.2016 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
05.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.01.2016 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
23.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
23.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
23.12.2015 Claims Appeal 3
23.12.2015 Claims Appeal 3
23.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.12.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
23.12.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
23.12.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
22.12.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 31
04.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.11.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
02.11.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
28.10.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.10.2015 Claims Appeal 4
05.10.2015 Claims Appeal 3
05.10.2015 Description Appeal 5
05.10.2015 Description Appeal 4
05.10.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
27.05.2015 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 4
24.04.2015 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
15.03.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
07.12.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
30.08.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.08.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
28.07.2011 Claims Appeal 2
28.07.2011 Claims Appeal 3
28.07.2011 Drawings Appeal 5
28.07.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
27.07.2011 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
27.07.2011 Claims Appeal 2
27.07.2011 Drawings Appeal 5
27.07.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
24.05.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.03.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.03.2011 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
17.03.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
17.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.03.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
17.03.2011 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
17.03.2011 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
17.03.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 12
17.03.2011 Means of redress Search / examination 2
17.03.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
17.03.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
17.03.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
17.03.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
14.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
14.12.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.12.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.12.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.12.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.12.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
14.12.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.12.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
13.12.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
29.11.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
23.11.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
19.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
19.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
19.11.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
19.11.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
19.11.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 4
30.09.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
29.09.2010 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.09.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
27.09.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 18
27.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
27.09.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
24.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
24.04.2006 Description Search / examination 1
24.04.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 28
24.04.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 31
24.04.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
24.02.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.02.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.10.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
14.10.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.02.2005 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.12.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.12.2004 European search report Search / examination 3
20.10.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.06.2004 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
27.05.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.05.2004 Claims Search / examination 4
27.05.2004 Description Search / examination 23
27.05.2004 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
27.05.2004 Drawings Search / examination 16
27.05.2004 Priority document Search / examination 35
27.05.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6