EP1488734 - Ophthalmologic image pickup apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/37] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobashi, Yasuhiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/52] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013176.5 | 03.06.2004 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | JP20030176346 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003176346 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1488734 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1488734 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/12, A61B3/14 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
A61B3/14 (EP,US);
A61B3/12 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/37] |
Former [2004/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ophthalmologisches Bildaufnahmegerät | [2004/52] | English: | Ophthalmologic image pickup apparatus | [2004/52] | French: | Appareil d'acquisition d'image ophthalmologique | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | FR | 30.06.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2010/23] | NL | 25.02.2009 | |
FR | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 25.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP4317626 ; | [A]JP4092640 ; | [A]JPH0255031 ; | [A]JP2000333906 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930326), vol. 0171, no. 54, Database accession no. (C - 1040), & JP4317626 A 19921109 (CANON INC) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920714), vol. 0163, no. 20, Database accession no. (C - 0962), & JP4092640 A 19920325 (TOPCON CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900515), vol. 0142, no. 27, Database accession no. (C - 0718), & JP2055031 A 19900223 (TOPCON CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, & JP2000333906 A 20001205 (CANON INC) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] * |