Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1487086

EP1487086 - Assembly for construction of an electric machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.06.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 22.09.2010  [2010/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG
Industriestrasse 3
77813 Bühl / DE
[2004/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Hill, Wolfgang
Ortenbergstrasse 3
76135 Karlsruhe / DE
 [2004/51]
Application number, filing date04013457.908.06.2004
[2004/51]
Priority number, dateDE200312605010.06.2003         Original published format: DE 10326050
[2004/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1487086
Date:15.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1487086
Date:20.07.2005
[2005/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1487086
Date:22.08.2007
Language:DE
[2007/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2005
ClassificationInternational:H02K3/12, H02K15/02
[2004/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/51]
TitleGerman:Bausatz zum Erstellen einer elektrischen Maschine[2004/51]
English:Assembly for construction of an electric machine[2004/51]
French:Assemblage pour une machine électrique[2004/51]
Examination procedure20.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/12]
28.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2007Fee for grant paid
11.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.08.2007
CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SI22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
TR22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
HU23.02.2008
[2010/38]
Former [2010/34]CY22.08.2007
CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SI22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
HU23.02.2008
Former [2009/35]CY22.08.2007
CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SI22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2009/29]CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SI22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2009/22]CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
EE22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/28]CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
RO22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
SE22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/25]CZ22.08.2007
DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
GB22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
SK22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
PT22.01.2008
Former [2008/23]DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
IE22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/22]DK22.08.2007
FI22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
GR23.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/14]FI22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
PL22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/11]FI22.08.2007
NL22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/09]NL22.08.2007
BG22.11.2007
ES03.12.2007
Former [2008/08]ES03.12.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]US6353198  (TONG WEI [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 10 - line 35 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 32; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4912831  (LEVINO ANDRE J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 11 * * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 28; figures 1,2a *;
 [A]JPS5658749  ;
 [A]US2002047454  (JOHO REINHARD [CH]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810805), vol. 005, no. 121, Database accession no. (E - 068), [A] 1 * abstract *