blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1500780 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1500780



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 123
22.11.2005 Closing of application Search / examination 1
16.08.2005 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.08.2005 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
11.08.2005 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
11.08.2005 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 4
11.08.2005 Means of redress Search / examination 1
04.08.2005 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.07.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
26.04.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.04.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.04.2005 Claims Search / examination 1
01.04.2005 Drawings Search / examination 2
01.04.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
15.12.2004 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.12.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.12.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.10.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.09.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
16.09.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.09.2004 European search report Search / examination 1
17.07.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.07.2004 Priority document Search / examination 16
21.06.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.06.2004 Claims Search / examination 3
21.06.2004 Description Search / examination 17
21.06.2004 Drawings Search / examination 7
21.06.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
14.06.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
14.06.2004 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 28