blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1500780


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.11.2005 Refusal of application published on  11.01.2006  [2006/02]
27.08.2005 Definitive list of designations published on  12.10.2005  [2005/41]
09.08.2005 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
27.07.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.04.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.04.2005 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.12.2004 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2005  [2005/04]
10.12.2004 Request for examination filed published on  26.01.2005  [2005/04]
10.12.2004 First examination report
07.12.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit