blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1500780
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202004009215U 20.01.2005U1
Priority number Date
DE202004009215 14.06.2004
DE10335020 24.07.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1500780Global Dossier 26.01.2005A1
Priority number Date
DE10335020 24.07.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE10335020 24.03.2005A1
Priority number Date
DE10335020 24.07.2003