Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1500780

EP1500780 - Drilling method and drilling device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  25.11.2005
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2005Refusal of applicationpublished on 11.01.2006  [2006/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Topf, Ernst
Marbachweg 31
72644 Oberboihingen / DE
[2005/04]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2005/04]
Representative(s)Jakelski, Joachim
Jakelski & Althoff
Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Mollenbachstrasse 37
71229 Leonberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/04]Jakelski, Joachim, Dr.
Otte & Jakelski Patentanwälte Mollenbachstrasse 37
71229 Leonberg / DE
Application number, filing date04013844.814.06.2004
[2005/04]
Priority number, dateDE200313502024.07.2003         Original published format: DE 10335020
[2005/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1500780
Date:26.01.2005
Language:DE
[2005/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:E21B6/04, B23B41/00
[2005/04]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2005/41]
Former [2005/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bohrverfahren und Bohrvorrichtung[2005/04]
English:Drilling method and drilling device[2005/04]
French:Procédé de forage et appareil de forage[2005/04]
Examination procedure01.10.2004Examination requested  [2005/04]
09.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/02]
21.08.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/02]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5342152  (MEDEKSZA LUDWIK A [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 68 * * column 6, line 24 - line 31 * * column 7, line 51 - column 10, line 68; figures 2,3,5-7 * [Y] 11-19;
 [XY]DE2436340  (VOEST AG) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,14 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 13,15-19;
 [Y]DE3225519  (SEEFLUTH CHRISTIAN U [DE]) [Y] 11 * page 3 - page 4; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE3617347  (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 48; figure 4 *;
 [Y]US2002084110  (HEINONEN JARMO [FI], et al) [Y] 14-19 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009]; figures 1,4 *